EP1065226 - Process for preparing redispersible powders of redispersible copolymers of vinylaromatic monomers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker Polymer Systems GmbH & Co. KG Johannes-Hess-Strasse 24 84489 Burghausen / DE | [2001/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mayer, Theo, Dr. Oberjulbachring 10 84387 Julbach / DE | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Schuderer, Michael, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Schuderer, Michael, Dr., et al Wacker-Chemie GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00111073.3 | 02.06.2000 | [2001/01] | Priority number, date | DE1999129008 | 24.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19929008 | [2001/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1065226 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1065226 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08F212/04 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
C08F212/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von in Wasser redispergierbaren Vinylaromat-Mischpolymerisat-Redispersionspulvern | [2001/01] | English: | Process for preparing redispersible powders of redispersible copolymers of vinylaromatic monomers | [2001/01] | French: | Procédé de préparation de poudres redispersables à l'eau de copolymères redispersables de monomères vinylaromatiques | [2001/01] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 02.06.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 15.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.11.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 19.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 16.08.2001 | FI | 16.08.2001 | GB | 16.08.2001 | IE | 16.08.2001 | LI | 16.08.2001 | NL | 16.08.2001 | DK | 16.11.2001 | PT | 16.11.2001 | SE | 16.11.2001 | GR | 17.11.2001 | [2005/16] |
Former [2004/51] | FI | 16.08.2001 | |
GB | 16.08.2001 | ||
IE | 16.08.2001 | ||
NL | 16.08.2001 | ||
DK | 16.11.2001 | ||
PT | 16.11.2001 | ||
SE | 16.11.2001 | ||
GR | 17.11.2001 | ||
Former [2003/45] | FI | 16.08.2001 | |
GB | 16.08.2001 | ||
IE | 16.08.2001 | ||
NL | 16.08.2001 | ||
DK | 16.11.2001 | ||
PT | 16.11.2001 | ||
SE | 16.11.2001 | ||
Former [2003/07] | FI | 16.08.2001 | |
GB | 16.08.2001 | ||
IE | 16.08.2001 | ||
NL | 16.08.2001 | ||
PT | 16.11.2001 | ||
SE | 16.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 16.08.2001 | |
GB | 16.08.2001 | ||
IE | 16.08.2001 | ||
PT | 16.11.2001 | ||
SE | 16.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/37] | FI | 16.08.2001 | |
GB | 16.08.2001 | ||
PT | 16.11.2001 | ||
SE | 16.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/25] | FI | 16.08.2001 | |
PT | 16.11.2001 | ||
SE | 16.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/20] | FI | 16.08.2001 | |
SE | 16.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | FI | 16.08.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4169828 (WRIGHT HAROLD A [US]); | [A]EP0007044 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [DA]DE19617716 (BASF AG [DE]) |