EP1060809 - Tube expanding tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REMS-WERK Christian Föll und Söhne GmbH & Co Stuttgarter Strasse 83 71332 Waiblingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states REMS-WERK Christian Föll und Söhne GmbH & Co Stuttgarter Strasse 83 71332 Waiblingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dr. Rudolf Wagner Mannheimer strasse 3 70376 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Georg Jäggi Markt 133 2572 Kaumburg / AT | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Kohl, Karl-Heinz Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. A.K. Jackisch-Kohl Dipl.-Ing. K.H. Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | Kohl, Karl-Heinz Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. A.K. Jackisch-Kohl Dipl.-Ing. K.H. Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00111236.6 | 25.05.2000 | [2000/51] | Priority number, date | DE1999124898 | 01.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19924898 | [2000/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1060809 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1060809 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B21D41/02, B29C57/04 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
B21D41/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/36] |
Former [2000/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Aufweitwerkzeug für Rohre | [2000/51] | English: | Tube expanding tool | [2000/51] | French: | Outil d' élargissement de tubes | [2000/51] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 21.06.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 24.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.07.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 31.03.2004 | AT | 25.05.2004 | [2014/11] |
Former [2005/51] | GB | 31.03.2004 | |
AT | 25.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | GB | 31.03.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0280884 ; | [XA]JPS6152948 ; | [X]FR2549748 (FRAMATOME SA [FR]) [X] 1-10 * page 6, line 33 - line 38; figure 3 *; | [XA]US4706355 (KUHNS JOHN P [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column W * [A] 6,8,10; | [X]US4934171 (KONETZKE JR HOWARD W [US]) [X] 1,2* figure - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900614), vol. 014, no. 276, Database accession no. (M - 0984), & JP02080884 A 19900320 (TAISEI CORP;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1-6,8-10 * figure 2 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860729), vol. 010, no. 216, Database accession no. (M - 502), & JP61052948 A 19860315 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-4 * abstract * [A] 6,8,10 |