EP1060879 - Heat insulating paper cups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fort James Corporation 133 Peachtree Street, N.E. Atlanta, Georgia 30303 / US | [2006/23] |
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states FORT JAMES CORPORATION 1650 Lake Cook Road Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fredricks, Richard E. 806 S. Summit Street Appleton, Wisconsin 54914 / US | 02 /
Breining, Michael A. 1030 Oak Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | 03 /
Pucci, William R. 5020 Breezewood Lane Winneconne, Wisconsin 54986 / US | 04 /
McCarthy, Donald C. 911 Foxmoor Lane Appleton, Wisconsin 54911 / US | 05 /
Brown, David C. 114 Vosburg Lane Clark Summit, Pennsylvania 18353 / US | 06 /
Segan, Richard A. 40 N. Whitfield Street Nazareth, Pennsylvania 18069 / US | 07 /
Malakhow, Walter 97 Teaneck Road Teaneck, New Jersey 07666 / US | [2006/23] |
Former [2000/51] | 01 /
Fredicks, Richard E. 806 S. Summit Street Appleton, Wisconsin 54914 / US | ||
02 /
Breining, Michael A. 1030 Oak Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | |||
03 /
Pucci, William R. 1449 Paynes Point Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | |||
04 /
McGarthy, Donald C. 911 Foxmoor Lane Appleton, Wisconsin 54911 / US | |||
05 /
Brown, David C. 114 Vosburg Lane Clarke Summit, Pennsylvania 18353 / US | |||
06 /
Segan, Richard A. 40 N. Whitfield Street Nazareth, Pennsylvania 18069 / US | |||
07 /
Malakhow, Walter 97 Teaneck Road Teaneck, New Jersey 07666 / US | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/51] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00111922.1 | 14.06.2000 | [2000/51] | Priority number, date | US19990334495 | 17.06.1999 Original published format: US 334495 | [2000/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1060879 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1060879 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | [2001/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1060879 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B32B29/00, B65D65/40, B32B27/10, B65D3/12, B65D81/38 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
B32B27/10 (EP,US);
B29C44/12 (EP,US);
B32B1/00 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B29/00 (EP,US);
B32B29/007 (US);
B32B5/18 (US);
B65D3/12 (EP,US);
B65D81/3874 (EP,US);
B31B2105/00 (EP,US);
B31B2105/001 (EP,US);
B31B2105/0022 (EP,US);
B31B2110/10 (EP,US);
B31B2120/402 (EP,US);
B31B2120/50 (EP,US);
B32B2266/025 (US);
B32B2317/12 (US);
B32B2323/04 (US);
B32B2323/046 (US);
B32B2439/02 (US);
Y10T428/1303 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1376 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2826 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/51] | B32B29/00, B65D65/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/51] | Title | German: | Wärmeisolierende Papierbecher | [2000/51] | English: | Heat insulating paper cups | [2000/51] | French: | Gobelets isolants en papier | [2000/51] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 02.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP04014580.7 / EP1473151 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.06.2006 | BE | 14.06.2006 | CH | 14.06.2006 | CY | 14.06.2006 | FI | 14.06.2006 | IE | 14.06.2006 | LI | 14.06.2006 | LU | 14.06.2006 | NL | 14.06.2006 | MC | 30.06.2006 | DK | 14.09.2006 | SE | 14.09.2006 | GR | 15.09.2006 | PT | 14.11.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LU | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 14.06.2006 | |
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 14.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9855281 (FORT JAMES CORP [US]) [A] 1-4 * claim - * * page 3, line 23 - page 5, line 9 * * page 6, line 7 - page 7, line 4 * * page 7, line 12 - line 16 * * page 9, line 8 ** example - * |