EP1061168 - A linear motor control device for driving knitting head components of a knitting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.2003 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DE | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] | 12.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TSUDAKOMA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 18-18, Nomachi 5-chome Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states TSUDAKOMA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 18-18, Nomachi 5-chome Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maenaka, Kouyuu 75, Yotsuyamachi Matto-shi, Ishikawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Araki, Nobuhiro Tsudakoma Kogyo K.K., 18-18, Nomachi 5-chome Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Takashima, Makoto Tsudakoma Kogyo K.K., 18-18, Nomachi 5-chome Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Tani, Tatsuya Tsudakoma Kogyo K.K., 18-18, Nomachi 5-chome Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Matuyama, Yutaka Tsudakoma Kogyo K.K., 18-18, Nomachi 5-chome Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa-ken / JP | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00111968.4 | 16.06.2000 | [2000/51] | Priority number, date | JP19990170351 | 16.06.1999 Original published format: JP 17035199 | [2000/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1061168 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1061168 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D04B15/32, D04B15/56 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
D04B15/32 (EP);
D04B15/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [2001/36] |
Former [2000/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung für einen Linearmotor zum Betrieb von Strickkomponenten einer Strickmaschine | [2000/51] | English: | A linear motor control device for driving knitting head components of a knitting machine | [2000/51] | French: | Dispositif de controle d'un moteur lineaire pour l'entrainement des components de tricotage d'un métier à tricoter | [2000/51] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 21.06.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 07.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.08.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 05.02.2003 | LI | 05.02.2003 | DE | 06.05.2003 | [2004/05] |
Former [2003/40] | CH | 05.02.2003 | |
LI | 05.02.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0916759 (TSUDAKOMA IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0821091 (TSUDAKOMA IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0235987 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) |