EP1028385 - Inventoriable-object control and tracking system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.08.2005 [2005/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Key-Trak, Inc. Suite 114, 1750 West Broadway Ovieda, FL 32765 / US | [2000/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maloney, Williamd C. 4693 Magnolia Circle Marietta, GA 30067 / US | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Schurack, Eduard F., et al ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | Schurack, Eduard F., et al Hofstetter, Schurack & Skora Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00111975.9 | 05.09.1996 | [2000/33] | Priority number, date | US19950003429 | 08.09.1995 Original published format: US 3429 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1028385 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1028385 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, G06F153/00 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/33] | G06F17/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/33] | Title | German: | Kontroll- und Verfolgungssystem für inventarisierbare Gegenstände | [2000/33] | English: | Inventoriable-object control and tracking system | [2000/33] | French: | Système de controle et de suivi d'objets inventoriables | [2000/33] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 11.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 09.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/31] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96930699.2 / EP0870261 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   31.12.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4595922 (COBB RICHARD G [US], et al) [A] 1-61* column W *; | [Y]US4635053 (BANKS EDWARD J K [GB], et al) [Y] 1-61 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 51; figure 2 *; | [Y]US5038023 (SALIGA THOMAS V [US]) [Y] 2,12-15,32-61 * column W *; | [Y]WO9504324 (MORSE WATCHMANS INC [US]) [Y] 1-61 * the whole document *; | [A]US5434775 (SIMS NATHANIEL M [US], et al) [A] 1-61 * column W * | Examination | GB1364535 | - BURSKY D., "MEMORY-BASED IDENTIFIER TAG PROVIDES DIGITAL ID", ELECTRONIC DESIGN, PENTON PUBLISHING, CLEVELAND, OH, US, (19910725), vol. 39, no. 14, pages 153 - 155-156, XP000258935 |