EP1061313 - Heating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [2004/48] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Str. 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | ||
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co. Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haibach, Dirk Erdelenstrasse 8 42855 Remscheid / DE | 02 /
Platte, Birgit III Uelfe 17 42477 Radevormwald / DE | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Hocker, Thomas Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Hocker, Thomas Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | ||
Former [2002/27] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/51] | Heim, Johann-Ludwig, Dipl.-Ing. c/o Johann Vaillant GmbH u. Co. Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | Application number, filing date | 00111984.1 | 19.06.2000 | [2000/51] | Priority number, date | AT19990001076 | 18.06.1999 Original published format: AT 107699 | [2000/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1061313 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1061313 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | [2002/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1061313 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F24H9/14 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
F24H9/14 (EP);
F24H9/142 (EP);
F24H9/146 (EP);
F24H1/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/51] | Title | German: | Heizgerät | [2000/51] | English: | Heating device | [2000/51] | French: | Appareil de chauffage | [2000/51] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/25] | 04.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 24.11.2004 | IE | 24.11.2004 | IT | 24.11.2004 | NL | 24.11.2004 | DK | 24.02.2005 | GR | 24.02.2005 | SE | 24.02.2005 | ES | 06.03.2005 | PT | 24.04.2005 | CY | 19.06.2005 | LU | 19.06.2005 | BE | 30.06.2005 | MC | 30.06.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
IT | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
CY | 19.06.2005 | ||
LU | 19.06.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
CY | 19.06.2005 | ||
LU | 19.06.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
CY | 19.06.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
ES | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 24.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0911590 (FALAVEGNA VALTER [IT], et al) [A] 1* figure - * |