EP1041554 - Method for recording digital data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2008 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumi, Chiyoko A3-202-, 3-1 Tsukumo-dai Suita-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Arimura, Ichiro 16, Fukakusakanjo-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, kyoto / JP | 03 /
Iketani, Akira 2-4-28, Nishizutsumi-hondorihigashi Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Yamada, Masazumi 6-24-10, Kinda-cho Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | 05 /
Juri, Tatsuro 1-5-8-2804, Tomobuchi-cho, Miyakojima-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 06 /
Kurano, Yukio 3-10-10, Rokumanji-cho Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 07 /
Kitamura, Yoshinori 30-1, Tenno-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka / JP | 08 /
Yamamitsu, Chojuro 1-1-131, Suimei-dai Kawanishi-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Avenue du Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | ||
Former [2000/40] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novapat International SA, 9, rue du Valais 1202 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 00112063.3 | 14.10.1994 | [2000/40] | Priority number, date | JP19930282013 | 15.10.1993 Original published format: JP 28201393 | JP19930283230 | 12.11.1993 Original published format: JP 28323093 | JP19930284825 | 15.11.1993 Original published format: JP 28482593 | JP19930289014 | 18.11.1993 Original published format: JP 28901493 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1041554 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1041554 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | [2001/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/10, G11B27/00, G11B15/18, H04N5/7826, G11B5/008, G11B20/00, H04N5/783 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
G11B27/11 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (EP,KR,US);
G11B15/02 (EP,US);
G11B15/07 (EP,US);
G11B15/087 (EP,US);
G11B15/125 (EP,US);
G11B15/1875 (EP,US);
G11B15/4671 (EP,US);
G11B15/4673 (EP,US);
G11B20/00007 (EP,US);
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B27/005 (EP,US);
G11B27/032 (EP,US);
G11B5/0086 (EP,US);
G11B5/09 (EP,US);
H03M13/00 (EP,US);
H03M7/30 (EP,US);
H04N5/78263 (EP,US);
H04N5/783 (EP,US);
H04N5/9205 (EP,US);
H04N9/7921 (EP,US);
G11B15/4731 (EP,US);
G11B15/52 (EP,US);
G11B15/602 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10592 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10981 (EP,US);
G11B2220/90 (EP,US);
G11B27/28 (EP,US);
H04N5/9201 (EP,US);
H04N5/9261 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Aufnahme von digitalen Daten | [2000/40] | English: | Method for recording digital data | [2000/40] | French: | Méthode d'enregistrement de données digitales | [2000/40] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 12.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/03] | 01.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94116225.7 / EP0649136 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JPH05282801 ; | [X]JPH03156773 ; | [X]US4862292 (ENARI MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 12, line 40 - column 13, line 33; claim 1 *; | [X]GB2251972 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4 * page 17, line 15 - line 21 * * page 20, line 12 * | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940207), vol. 018, no. 074, Database accession no. (P - 1688), & JP05282801 A 19931029 (TOSHIBA CORP) [XP] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911007), vol. 015, no. 395, Database accession no. (P - 1260), & JP03156773 A 19910704 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | Examination | JPS6326865 | JPS63166085 | JPH0249275 |