EP1059075 - Mobile wheeled chair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brustmann, Herbert Kardinal-Wendel-Strasse 90 82515 Wolfratshausen / DE | [2000/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Nöth, Heinz Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Nöth, Heinz, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt, Arnulfstrasse 25 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00112090.6 | 05.06.2000 | [2000/50] | Priority number, date | DE1999126511 | 10.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19926511 | [2000/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1059075 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1059075 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | [2001/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1059075 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61G5/00 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
A61G5/107 (EP);
A61G5/006 (EP);
A61G5/1075 (EP);
A61G5/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/50] | Title | German: | Fahrbarer Stuhl | [2000/50] | English: | Mobile wheeled chair | [2000/50] | French: | Chaise mobile à roulettes | [2000/50] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/21] | 02.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.12.2005 | FI | 07.12.2005 | IE | 07.12.2005 | DK | 07.03.2006 | GR | 07.03.2006 | PT | 08.05.2006 | LU | 05.06.2006 | BE | 30.06.2006 | MC | 30.06.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
DK | 07.03.2006 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
LU | 05.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
DK | 07.03.2006 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
IT | 07.12.2005 | ||
DK | 07.03.2006 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
DK | 07.03.2006 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
DK | 07.03.2006 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
DK | 07.03.2006 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 07.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1225572 (RONDEL) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]US3406772 (ADOLF AHRENT GUSTAV, et al) [X] 1,3,4 * column W *; | [Y]GB1301595 (HUGH STEEPER) [Y] 6* the whole document *; | [X]DE8711762U (KERSTHOLT) [X] 1,3,4,9,10 * figure 3 *; | [X]EP0463652 (REVAB BV [NL]) [X] 1,3,4,11,13 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0558858 (BESSIERE NOEL [FR], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 26 * * column 6, line 14 - line 27; figures 1,7 *; | [XY]WO9852509 (SMITH KARL WINGETT [GB], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 4, line 1 - line 9; figure 8 * [Y] 6 |