EP1063345 - Reinforced membranes for roofing and other applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johns Manville International, Inc. 717 17th Street Denver, CO 80202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states Johns Manville International, Inc. 717 17th Street Denver, Colorado 80202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hindi, Majid H. 5649 South Harlan Street Littleton, Colorado 80123 / US | 02 /
Flynn, Allison 569 24th Road Grand Junction Colorado 81501 / US | [2001/06] |
Former [2000/52] | 01 /
Hindi, Majid H. 5649 South Harlan Street Littleton, Colorado 80123 / US | ||
02 /
Flynn, Allison 344 Goldco Circle Golden, Colorado 80403 / US | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | Grättinger & Partner (GbR) Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00112187.0 | 07.06.2000 | [2000/52] | Priority number, date | US19990344295 | 24.06.1999 Original published format: US 344295 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1063345 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1063345 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | [2002/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D06N5/00, E04D5/02, E04D5/10, B32B27/02, B32B27/04, B32B27/12, B32B27/32 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B5/024 (US);
D06N3/045 (EP,US);
D06N5/00 (EP,US);
E04D5/10 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0253 (US);
B32B2305/70 (US);
B32B2419/06 (US);
Y10T428/31909 (EP,US);
Y10T442/162 (EP,US);
Y10T442/164 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2002/50] |
Former [2000/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verstärkungsverbundwerkstoff für Dachbahnen und andere Anwendungen | [2000/52] | English: | Reinforced membranes for roofing and other applications | [2000/52] | French: | Produit composite de renforcement de membranes de toiture et autres applications | [2000/52] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 08.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/48] | 03.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0947313 (BOREALIS AG [AT]) [PX] 1-4,6,9-11 * example 1 * * claims 1,9,10 *; | [Y]US4435466 (KUHNEL WERNER [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2,9 * figure 1 * * column 1, lines 1-10 * * column 2, lines 22-40 * * columns 341-56 * * claim 1 *; | [Y]AU665445B (CSR LTD) [Y] 1,2,9 * figure 1 * * page 2, lines 1-7 * * page 5, lines 5-13 * |