EP1061370 - A method for detection of carcinoembryonic antigens having a modified sugar chain structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wako Pure Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-2, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-8605 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states Wako Pure Chemical Industies, Ltd. 1-2, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-8605 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hosokawa, Hideaki 6-1, Takada-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0963 / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Kenji 6-1, Takada-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0963 / JP | 03 /
Satomura, Shinji 1-2, Soshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-8605 / JP | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2000/51] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 00112207.6 | 07.06.2000 | [2000/51] | Priority number, date | JP19990172485 | 18.06.1999 Original published format: JP 17248599 | [2000/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1061370 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1061370 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | [2001/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
G01N33/57473 (EP,US);
G01N2400/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Nachweis von karzinoembryonalen Antigenen mit einer modifizierten Zuckerkettenstruktur | [2000/51] | English: | A method for detection of carcinoembryonic antigens having a modified sugar chain structure | [2000/51] | French: | Méthode pour la détection des antigènes carcinoembryonnaires ayant une structure modifié d'une chaîne de sucre | [2000/51] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/43] | 14.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 08.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0399464 (ISHIKAWA EIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10 * page 3, line 30 - page 5, line 43; claims 1-7 * [Y] 1-24; | [XY]JPH07126299 (MORINAGA & CO) [X] 11 * abstract * [Y] 1-24; | [XY] - NAGATA, MIURA ET AL, "Sandwich assay for carcinoembryonic antigen with immobilized lectins and a monoclonal antibody", TUMOR BIOLOGY, (1991), vol. 12, pages 35 - 44, XP000985494 [X] 1-4,9,11 * abstract; page 36 - page 37 * [Y] 12-16,23,24 | [A] - BLASZCZYK, M., KOON YAN PAK ET AL, "Characterization of gastrointestinal tumor associated carcinoembryonic antigen related antigens defined by monoclonal antibodies", CANCER RESEARCH, (198401), vol. 44, pages 245 - 253, XP000985483 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * | [Y] - YANG G, "Carcinoembryonic antigens defined by a panel of monoclonal antibodies and their biochemical characteristics", JOURNAL OF CHINA MEDICAL UNIVERSITY, (1989), vol. 18, no. 1, XP000985621 [Y] 1-8,18-20 * abstract * |