EP1061013 - Storage shelving [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HÄNEL & CO. Bafflestrasse 21 CH-9450 Altstätten SG / CH | [2000/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hänel, Michael Hauptstrasse 13 74177 Bad Friedrichshall / DE | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Preissner, Nicolaus, et al Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 31 02 03 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | Preissner, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Michelis & Preissner, Haimhauser Strasse 1 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00112319.9 | 08.06.2000 | [2000/51] | Priority number, date | DE1999127248 | 15.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19927248 | [2000/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1061013 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/127, A47B49/00, A61J7/00 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
A47B49/002 (EP,US);
B65G1/127 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/51] | Title | German: | Lagerregal | [2000/51] | English: | Storage shelving | [2000/51] | French: | Etagère de stockage | [2000/51] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 26.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/09] | 13.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2165122 (ASHBERY RAY S) [A] 6 * page 1, column 2, line 27 - page 2, column 2, line 23 * * figures 1-11 *; | [A]DE2444891 (SPERRY RAND CORP) [A] 1 * page 4, line 21 - page 7, line 8 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5438523 (HUMM SIEGFRIED [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 16 - column 10, line 33 ** figures 1-7 *; | [Y]US5638985 (FITZGERALD ROBERT M [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,7-9 * column 4, line 58 - column 16, line 26 * * figures 1-11B *; | [DYA]US5836662 (ROBEY TIMOTHY J [US]) [DY] 1-3,7-9 * column 3, line 60 - column 8, line 19 * * figures 1-17 * [A] 4,5 | by applicant | US5820237 | US5836662 |