EP1059726 - FM demodulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Yuji, c/o Pioneer Corporation Kawagoe Works. No.25-1, Aza-Nishicho, Oaza-Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00112325.6 | 08.06.2000 | [2000/50] | Priority number, date | JP19990165415 | 11.06.1999 Original published format: JP 16541599 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1059726 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1059726 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03D3/00 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
H03D3/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/36] |
Former [2000/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | FM-Demodulator | [2000/50] | English: | FM demodulator | [2000/50] | French: | Démodulateur FM | [2000/50] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 19.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60194809 ; | [A]US4603300 (WELLES II KENNETH B [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 56 - column 7, line 36; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4910469 (TAKAHASHI MINORU [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 47 - column 5, line 12; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5872815 (STROLLE CHRISTOPHER HUGH [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 7, line 51 - column 9, line 20; figure 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860215), vol. 010, no. 039, Database accession no. (E - 381), & JP60194809 A 19851003 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |