EP1162254 - Liquid all-purpose cleaners [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd. Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states CLARIANT INTERNATIONAL LTD. Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gallotti, Manlio Alameda Itu 1420 apto 101 Sao Paulo-SP CEP 01421-001 / BR | 02 /
Nunes, George Av. Valdomiro Macario 215 apto 34A Guaruja-SP CEP 11472-100 / BR | 03 /
Andrade Da Luz, Marcelo R. Adolfo Bergamini 55 Sao Paulo-SP CEP 03168-030 / BR | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Mikulecky, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent & License Management Chemicals Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Mikulecky, Klaus, Dr., et al Clariant Service GmbH Patente, Marken, Lizenzen Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | ||
Former [2001/50] | Otto, Adalbert, Dr., et al Clariant GmbH, Patente, Marken, Lizenzen, Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 00112375.1 | 09.06.2000 | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1162254 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/65, C11D1/835, C11D1/86 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
C11D1/835 (EP,US);
C11D1/65 (EP,US);
C11D1/86 (EP,US);
C11D1/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/50] | Title | German: | Flüssige Allzweckreinigungszusammensetzungen | [2001/50] | English: | Liquid all-purpose cleaners | [2001/50] | French: | Compositions de nettoyage liquides polyvalentes | [2001/50] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 12.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19723990 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,7-10 * claims 1-5 *; | [X]GB2320030 (RECKITT & COLMAN INC [US]) [X] 1,4,7,10 * page 3, line 10 - line 18 * * claims 1-6 *; | [X]US4759867 (CHOY CLEMENT KIN-MAN [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7,9,10 * claims 1-4 *; | [X]WO9816605 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [X] 1,4,9,10 * claims 1-7 *; | [X]WO9718285 (RECKITT & COLMAN INC [US]) [X] 1,4,6-10 * page 4, line 21 - line 27 * * claims 1-7 *; | [X]US6004916 (MILLS SCOTT C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,9,10 * claims 1-10 *; | [X]US5939374 (RICHTER ALAN FRANCIS [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-10 * claims 1-7,12 *; | [A]US4597887 (COLODNEY DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,7,9,10 * claims 1-13 * |