EP1060985 - Air conditioning system for passenger aircraft cargo space [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2002/06] |
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states EADS Airbus GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scheffler, Hans-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Wendloher Weg 14 20251 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Markwart, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Hartkirchener Chaussee 7A 25469 Halstenbek / DE | 03 /
Buchholz, Uwe, Dipl.-Ing. Auf der Worth 17 21640 Bliedersdorf / DE | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Hansmann, Dierk Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | Hansmann, Dierk, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00112464.3 | 10.06.2000 | [2000/51] | Priority number, date | DE1999127606 | 17.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19927606 | [2000/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1060985 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1060985 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1060985 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B64C13/08, B64D13/08 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
B64D13/08 (EP,US);
Y02T50/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/51] | B64C13/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/51] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Klimatisierung von Unterflurbereichen eines Passagierflugzeuges | [2000/51] | English: | Air conditioning system for passenger aircraft cargo space | [2000/51] | French: | Système de climatisation pour la soute à fret d'un aéronef de passager | [2000/51] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 27.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.05.2004 | FI | 06.05.2004 | IE | 06.05.2004 | IT | 06.05.2004 | NL | 06.05.2004 | AT | 10.06.2004 | LU | 10.06.2004 | BE | 30.06.2004 | CH | 30.06.2004 | LI | 30.06.2004 | MC | 30.06.2004 | DK | 06.08.2004 | GR | 06.08.2004 | SE | 06.08.2004 | ES | 17.08.2004 | PT | 06.10.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | CY | 06.05.2004 | |
FI | 06.05.2004 | ||
IE | 06.05.2004 | ||
IT | 06.05.2004 | ||
NL | 06.05.2004 | ||
AT | 10.06.2004 | ||
LU | 10.06.2004 | ||
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 06.08.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CY | 06.05.2004 | |
FI | 06.05.2004 | ||
IE | 06.05.2004 | ||
NL | 06.05.2004 | ||
AT | 10.06.2004 | ||
LU | 10.06.2004 | ||
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 06.08.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 06.05.2004 | |
IE | 06.05.2004 | ||
NL | 06.05.2004 | ||
AT | 10.06.2004 | ||
LU | 10.06.2004 | ||
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 06.08.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 06.05.2004 | |
IE | 06.05.2004 | ||
AT | 10.06.2004 | ||
LU | 10.06.2004 | ||
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 06.08.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | FI | 06.05.2004 | |
IE | 06.05.2004 | ||
LU | 10.06.2004 | ||
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 06.08.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/25] | FI | 06.05.2004 | |
IE | 06.05.2004 | ||
LU | 10.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 06.08.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 06.05.2004 | |
IE | 06.05.2004 | ||
LU | 10.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 06.08.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | FI | 06.05.2004 | |
IE | 06.05.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 06.08.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 06.05.2004 | |
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 06.08.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 06.05.2004 | |
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 06.05.2004 | |
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 06.05.2004 | |
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 06.08.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4445342 (WARNER JOHN L [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 3, lines 15-22 * * column 3, lines 47-53 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5516330 (DECHOW MARTIN DIPL ING [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 10, lines 3-29 ** figure 3 * | by applicant | DE4335152 |