EP1061285 - Belt for continuously variable transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aoyama, Hideaki c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Shimada, Takamichi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Prechtel, Jörg, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/51] | Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann, Patentanwälte, Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00112598.8 | 14.06.2000 | [2000/51] | Priority number, date | JP19990173246 | 18.06.1999 Original published format: JP 17324699 | [2000/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1061285 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1061285 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16G5/16 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
F16G5/16 (EP,US);
F16G5/163 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2001/36] |
Former [2000/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Riemen für stufenlos regelbares Getriebe | [2000/51] | English: | Belt for continuously variable transmission | [2000/51] | French: | Courroie pour transmission continûment variable | [2000/51] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 14.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0278545 (DOORNES TRANSMISSIE BV [NL]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4826473 (MIYAWAKI MOTOHISA [JP]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [D]JP5064254B | by applicant | JPH0537067U | JPH055310U | JPH0564254 |