EP1063024 - Device for the variable adjustment of the stand centre on rolling stands [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2000/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minnerop, Michael Schumannsdieken 31 40885 Ratingen / DE | 02 /
Reismann, Hans-Jürgen Zeppenheimer Dorfstrasse 21 40489 Düsseldorf / DE | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Valentin, Ekkehard Patentanwälte Hemmerich & Kollegen Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hemmerich & Kollegen, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [2000/52] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00112631.7 | 15.06.2000 | [2000/52] | Priority number, date | DE1999129035 | 25.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19929035 | [2000/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1063024 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1063024 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B21B31/18, B21B31/02 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
B21B31/02 (EP);
B21B31/18 (EP);
B21B2013/106 (EP);
B21B2031/023 (EP);
B21B2273/22 (EP);
B21B31/04 (EP);
B21B31/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, IT, SE [2001/44] |
Former [2001/40] | AT, IT, SE | ||
Former [2001/37] | AT, BE, IT, SE | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur verändernden Einstellung der Gerüstmitte an Walzgerüsten | [2000/52] | English: | Device for the variable adjustment of the stand centre on rolling stands | [2000/52] | French: | Dispositif pour l'ajustement variable le centre d'une cage dans des laminoirs | [2000/52] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 28.06.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.02.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT | 03.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.08.2001 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 10.12.2003 | [2004/16] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05261406 ; | [A]GB191114346 (FAWELL JOSEPH [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 3, line 3 - line 34; figures 4,7 *; | [A]US1865286 (SODERBERG ANDREW W, et al) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE677324 (KRUPP FRIED GRUSONWERK AG) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3048280 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND [JP]) [A] 1* page 4 - page 6; figures 2,3; claim - *; | [A]DE3406659 (SACILOR [FR]) [A] 1,3 * figures 1-4; claims 1,4,8,10 *; | [A]US4706484 (DITTMAR ROBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3 - column 5; figures 1-6 *; | [DA]EP0786291 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [DA] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19816319 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [A] 1,3 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940114), vol. 018, no. 023, Database accession no. (M - 1541), & JP05261406 A 19931012 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |