EP1065692 - Flat field electron emission source and method of its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Codixx AG Am Fuchsberg 6 39112 Magdeburg / DE | [2001/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2001/01] | Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00112734.9 | 16.06.2000 | [2001/01] | Priority number, date | DE1999131328 | 01.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19931328 | [2001/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1065692 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/01] | Classification | IPC: | H01J1/30 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP);
H01J1/304 (EP);
H01J2201/30446 (EP);
H01J2201/30469 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Flächige Elektronen-Feldemissionsquelle und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2001/01] | English: | Flat field electron emission source and method of its production | [2001/01] | French: | Source plane d'électrons à champ et methode pour sa fabrication | [2001/01] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/35] | 19.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |