EP1061215 - Drive arrangement for an espagnolette lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAUTAU GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 56-60 31691 Helpsen / DE | [2008/04] |
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states Hautau GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 56-60 31691 Helpsen / DE | ||
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states Hautau Gmbh Bahnhofstrasse 56-60 31691 Helpsen / DE | ||
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states W. HAUTAU GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 56-60 D-31691 Helpsen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dralle, Manfred Driegelweg 1 31693 Hespe / DE | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Leonhard, Frank Reimund, et al Leonhard & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | Leonhard, Frank Reimund, Dipl.-Ing., et al Leonhard - Olgemöller - Fricke Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 57 80083 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00112905.5 | 19.06.2000 | [2000/51] | Priority number, date | DE1999127761 | 17.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19927761 | DE1999129742 | 29.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19929742 | [2000/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1061215 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1061215 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1061215 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E05C9/06 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
E05C9/066 (EP);
E05C9/008 (EP);
E05C9/041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/51] | Title | German: | Getriebeanordnung für einen Stangenverschluss | [2000/51] | English: | Drive arrangement for an espagnolette lock | [2000/51] | French: | Dispositf de transmission pour serrure à espagnolette | [2000/51] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 08.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Request for further processing for: | 30.07.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 30.07.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.09.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.01.2008 | DK | 23.01.2008 | FI | 23.01.2008 | IE | 23.01.2008 | IT | 23.01.2008 | NL | 23.01.2008 | SE | 23.04.2008 | GR | 24.04.2008 | ES | 04.05.2008 | LU | 19.06.2008 | PT | 23.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/28] | CY | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
IT | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
LU | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CY | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
IT | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | DK | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | ES | 04.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2251215 (FICHET BAUCHE [FR]) [X] 20 * the whole document * [A] 13,15,16; | [Y]GB2002844 (LOWE & FLETCHER AUSTRALIA) [Y] 17 * figure 5 *; | [XA]FR2430502 (PICARD [FR]) [X] 20 * the whole document * [A] 13,15-19; | [XY]DE3139574 (SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]) [X] 1,5,10,14 * page 8, line 1 - page 12, line 23 * * page 14, line 13 - line 18 * * page 16, line 15 - page 20, line 23; figure - * [Y] 13,15,17; | [A]FR2521202 (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]) [A] 1,14 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE3834373 (MELCHERT BESCHLAEGE [DE]) [DA] 1,14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0560017 (MELCHERT BESCHLAEGE [DE]) [A] 1,14 * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 10 * * column 5, line 41 - column 7, line 34; figure - *; | [XY]EP0805249 (VAK PICARD [FR]) [X] 20 * the whole document *[Y] 13,15 |