EP1168857 - System for mobility management in a telecommunication network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A. St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becker, Helmut Marienbader Str. 45 83043 Bad Aibling / DE | 02 /
Dillis, Jan Pannenkuisstraat 308 2506 Liez / BE | 03 /
Galensa, Klaus 315 Palmwood Pl. Apt. 217 Boca Raton, FL 33431 / US | 04 /
Rückstuhl, Hanspeter Wolframstrasse 20 82515 Wolframshausen / DE | [2002/01] | Application number, filing date | 00113264.6 | 21.06.2000 | [2002/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1168857 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/00, H04Q7/24 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
H04W8/04 (EP);
H04Q3/0045 (EP);
H04W76/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB [2002/43] |
Former [2002/38] | |||
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anordnung zum Mobilitätsmanagement in einem Telekommunikationsnetz | [2002/01] | English: | System for mobility management in a telecommunication network | [2002/01] | French: | Gestion de la mobilité dans un réseau de télécommunications | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2000 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 03.07.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.10.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 31.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 10.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/27] | 11.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.08.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   21.08.2002 | 06.08.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   21.08.2002 | 06.08.2002 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   21.08.2002 | 06.08.2002 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   21.08.2002 | 06.08.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9851097 (GLOBAL MOBILITY SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,9,10 * page 16, line 22 - page 18, line 22 * * claims 1-29 * [A] 5-8; | [XA]WO9859507 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-4,9,10 * page 5, line 5 - line 19 * * claims 1-13 * [A] 5-8; | [A]WO9837724 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 8 - page 4, line 3 *; | [A]US5629974 (RAJALA JUSSI [FI], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 9 - column 5, line 9 * * claims 1-21 * |