EP1143359 - System and method for managing advertising space [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yoshio, Ohyama 16-6, Higashikaigan-Kita, 4-Chome Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Yoshio, Ohyama 16-6, Higashikaigan-Kita, 4-Chome Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshio, Ohyama 14-6, Higashikaigan-Kita, 4-chome Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/41] | Meddle, Alan Leonard FORRESTER & BOEHMERT, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00113271.1 | 21.06.2000 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | JP20000103350 | 05.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000103350 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1143359 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1143359 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0241 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0256 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0257 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0277 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zum Verwalten von Werbeflächen | [2001/41] | English: | System and method for managing advertising space | [2001/41] | French: | Système et méthode de gestion d'espaces publicitaires | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/28] | 03.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/27] | 14.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.05.2002 | M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search |