EP1067240 - Snow-removing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/11] |
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanafusa, Jitsumi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1 Chuo, 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Ito, Tomoki c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1 Chuo, 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Sakai, Seishu c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1 Chuo, 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Yamamoto, Takahiro c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1 Chuo, 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 05 /
Yamamoto, Masayuki c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1 Chuo, 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/02] | Liska, Horst, Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00113281.0 | 21.06.2000 | [2001/02] | Priority number, date | JP19990194401 | 08.07.1999 Original published format: JP 19440199 | JP19990195728 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: JP 19572899 | [2001/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1067240 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1067240 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1067240 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E01H5/04, F16F9/02 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
E01H5/04 (EP,US);
F16F9/0272 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI, SE [2003/08] |
Former [2001/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schneeräumgerät | [2001/02] | English: | Snow-removing machine | [2001/02] | French: | Dispositif chasse-neige | [2001/02] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 03.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04026087.9 / EP1503001 | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01198910 ; | [A]US4756101 (FRIBERG NATHAN J [US], et al) [A] 1,4* the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891109), vol. 013, no. 498, Database accession no. (M - 890), & JP01198910 A 19890810 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,4 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS6123059 |