EP1042953 - Use of acyclic and carbocylic ketones, alcohols, aldehydes, nitriles and esters for repelling or attracting insects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2002 [2002/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC. 521 West 57th Street New York, NY 10019 / US | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA 223 Grinter Hall Gainesville Florida 32611 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC. 521 West 57th Street New York New York 10019 / US | ||
For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA 223 Grinter Hall Gainesville, Florida 32611 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marin, Anna B. 207 Lafayette Circle Cincinnati, Ohio 45220 / US | 02 /
Narula, Anubhav P.S. 52 Cresci Boulevard Hazlet, County of Monmouth, NJ 07730 / US | 03 /
Warren, Craig B. 3 Dogwood Lane, Rumson County of Monmouth, NJ 07760 / US | 04 /
Butler, Jerry F. 3541 Northwest 33rd Place Gainesville, Florida 32605 / US | [2001/10] |
Former [2000/41] | 01 /
Marin, Anna B. 316 Fairfield Avenue, Long Branch Country of Monmouth, NJ 07740 / US | ||
02 /
Narula, Anubhav P.S. 52 Cresci Boulevard Hazlet, County of Monmouth, NJ 07730 / US | |||
03 /
Warren, Craig B. 3 Dogwood Lane, Rumson County of Monmouth, NJ 07760 / US | |||
04 /
Butler, Jerry F. 3542 Northwest, 33rd Place Gainesville, County of Alachua, FL 32605 / US | Representative(s) | Richardson, Kate Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Richardson, Kate Forrester & Boehmert, Franz-Joseph Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00113370.1 | 13.05.1994 | [2000/41] | Priority number, date | US19930061044 | 14.05.1993 Original published format: US 61044 | US19930157043 | 26.11.1993 Original published format: US 157043 | US19930157420 | 26.11.1993 Original published format: US 157420 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1042953 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1042953 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | [2000/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A01N31/04, A01N35/02, A01N35/04, A01N45/02, A01N47/06, A01N49/00 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
A01N35/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2000/41] | Title | German: | Verwendung von acyclischen und carbocyclischen Ketonen, Alkoholen, Aldehyden, Nitrilen und Estern zum Vertreiben oder Anlocken von Insekten | [2000/41] | English: | Use of acyclic and carbocylic ketones, alcohols, aldehydes, nitriles and esters for repelling or attracting insects | [2000/41] | French: | Utilisation de cétones, d'alcools, d'aldéhydes, de nitriles et d'esters acycliques et carbocycliques pour repousser ou attirer les insectes | [2000/41] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 14.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/01] | 24.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/01] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94303455.3 / EP0629344 | EP97115942.1 / EP0815728 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4507225 (SPRECKER MARK A [US], et al) [A] 2,3 * column 9, line 32 - line 35 * * examples 5,12 *; | [A]US4219570 (INAZUKA SHINICHI [JP], et al) |