EP1070801 - Support system made of a lattice girder and a wooden section [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HVG - Haass Vertriebsgesellschaft für Bauelemente mbH Wiesenstrasse 39 64331 Weiterstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states HVG - Haass Vertriebsgesellschaft für Bauelemente mbH Wiesenstrasse 39 64331 Weiterstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haass, Bernd Wiesenstrasse 39 64331 Weiterstadt / DE | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2001/04] | Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00113642.3 | 28.06.2000 | [2001/04] | Priority number, date | DE1999133101 | 15.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19933101 | [2001/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1070801 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1070801 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | [2001/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1070801 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E04C5/065, E04C3/292 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
E04C5/065 (EP);
E04C3/292 (EP);
E04C5/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/04] | Title | German: | Tragsystem aus Gitterträger und Profilholz | [2001/04] | English: | Support system made of a lattice girder and a wooden section | [2001/04] | French: | Structure porteuse composée d'une poutre à treillis et d'un profilé en bois | [2001/04] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 21.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 18.09.2002 | IE | 18.09.2002 | DK | 18.12.2002 | SE | 18.12.2002 | [2007/10] |
Former [2003/42] | GR | 18.09.2002 | |
IE | 18.09.2002 | ||
SE | 18.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 18.09.2002 | |
SE | 18.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | SE | 18.12.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE382045 (JAKOB MELLES) [A] 1-4 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE810188 (VOLLMAR HANS) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [Y]DE1269324 (WALTER HASLINGER) [Y] 1-4 * column 4, line 10 - line 31; figure 5 *; | [A]FR2191001 (NEUNKIRCHEN FRA CE [FR]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]WO8001297 (FRELENA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]WO8504207 (STALIN LARS) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]WO8803210 (STALIN KONSULTER AB [SE]) [Y] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]WO8900226 (SMEDJEBACKEN BOXHOLM STAAL [SE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO9311323 (WEGLER GEORGE [SE]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [AD]DE29806562U (MAACK PETER DR ING [DE]) [AD] 1* figure - * | by applicant | EP0494612 | DE29806562U | DE19743846 |