EP1069672 - Power supply with transformer choke [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | [2001/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lang, Gerhard Merzhäuser Strasse 26 61276 Altweilnau / DE | [2001/03] | Application number, filing date | 00113753.8 | 29.06.2000 | [2001/03] | Priority number, date | DE1999132379 | 13.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19932379 | [2001/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1069672 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1069672 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | [2002/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/00, H02J7/00, H02M3/156 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
H02M1/32 (EP,US);
H02M3/10 (KR);
H02J7/0029 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/03] | H02M1/00, H02J7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/03] | Title | German: | Drosselwandler | [2001/03] | English: | Power supply with transformer choke | [2001/03] | French: | Alimentation à découpage avec bobine de transformateur | [2001/03] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 07.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/26] | 07.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02168864 ; | [X]EP0090237 (FIAR SPA [IT]) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * page 3, line 29 - page 6, line 12 *; | [A]US4428015 (NESLER JOHN J [US]) [A] 6 * figure 1 * * column 4, line 3 - line 16 *; | [X]DE3343883 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,6 * figures 1-4 * * page 3, line 16 - page 7, line 2 *; | [X]US4630187 (HENZE CHRISTOPHER P [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 7 - line 10 *; | [A]FR2610149 (TELECOMMUNICATIONS SA [FR]) [A] 6 * page 6, line 10 - line 12 *; | [X]US4929882 (SZEPESI TAMAS S [US]) [X] 1,8 * figures 1,3 * * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 15 *; | [X]EP0617501 (LINEAR TECHN INC [US]) [X] 1,4,7 * abstract * * page 10, line 18 - line 28 * * column 10, line 46 - line 53 * * figure 4 *; | [X]US5359281 (BARROW STEVEN M [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 53 - line 68 * * column 4, line 48 - line 62 * * column 5, line 27 - line 48 * * column 6, line 5 - line 28 *; | [X]US5498995 (SZEPESI THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 4, line 28 - line 30 * * column 5, line 28 - line 30 * * column 6, line 33 - line 35 *; | [A]US5552695 (SCHWARTZ PETER H [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 28 - line 31 *; | [X]US5555148 (MATSUZAKI HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-6 * abstract * * figures 1,4 * * column 2, line 55 - line 65 *; | [X]US5563781 (CLAUTER STEVEN T [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 38 - line 55 * * column 7, line 16 - line 38 * * column 9, line 64 - column 10, line 9 *; | [A]US5568347 (SHIRAI KATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 6 * figure 1 ** column 6, line 39 - line 55 *; | [X]WO9917434 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,7 * abstract * * figures 1,2,6,7,10,12 *; | [PX]US5926383 (PILUKAITIS RAYMOND W [US], et al) [PX] 1-3 * abstract * * column 7, line 41 - column 8, line 6 * * column 8, line 38 - line 43 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900917), vol. 014, no. 433, Database accession no. (E - 979), & JP02168864 A 19900628 (ORIGIN ELECTRONIC CO.) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract * |