EP1071100 - Use of barrier refractive or anti-reflective layer to improve laser trim characteristics of thin film resistors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intersil Corporation 2401 Palm Bay Road, N.E. Palm Bay Florida 32905 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states Intersil Corporation 2401 Palm Bay Road, N.E. Palm Bay, Florida 32905 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morrison, Michael 3445 Huggins Drive Malabar, FL 32950 / US | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Meddle, Alan L., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | Meddle, Alan Leonard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00114638.0 | 07.07.2000 | [2001/04] | Priority number, date | US19990358266 | 21.07.1999 Original published format: US 358266 | [2001/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1071100 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1071100 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01C17/242, H01L21/02 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
H01L28/24 (EP,US);
H01S5/20 (KR);
B23K26/0006 (EP,US);
B23K26/009 (EP,US);
B23K26/53 (EP,US);
B23K26/57 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/04] | H01C17/242 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verwendung einer Barriereschicht oder einer Antireflexionsschicht zur Verbesserung der Lasertrimmeigenschaften von Dünnschichtwiderständen | [2001/04] | English: | Use of barrier refractive or anti-reflective layer to improve laser trim characteristics of thin film resistors | [2001/04] | French: | Utilisation d'une couche de barrière refractrice ou d'une couche antireflexion pour améliorer les charactéristiques de taillage au laser de résistances à couche mince | [2001/04] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5608257 (LEE PEI-ING P [US], et al) [DA] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]JP01073659 ; | [A]EP0704864 (SUMITOMO METAL CERAMICS INC [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890706), vol. 013, no. 292, Database accession no. (E - 782), & JP01073659 A 19890317 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * |