EP1068900 - Activated Raney-metal catalysts made of hollow bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/03] | Metal catalysts made of hollow spheres | ||
[2002/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states Degussa AG Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | |||
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states Degussa AG Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 68 80636 München / DE | |||
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Degussa AG Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ostgard, Daniel, Dr. Robert-Koch-Strasse 3 63801 Kleinostheim / DE | 02 /
Panster, Peter, Dr. Im Lochseif 8 63517 Rodenbach / DE | 03 /
Rehren, Claus, Dr. Grünewaldstrasse 3 63739 Aschaffenburg / DE | 04 /
Berweiler, Monika Tilsiter Strasse 10 63477 Maintal / DE | 05 /
Stephani, Günther, Dr. Sonnenblick 7 01454 Grosserkmannsdorf / DE | 06 /
Schneider, Lother, Dr. Serkowitzer Strasse 6E 01640 Coswig / DE | [2001/03] | Application number, filing date | 00115180.2 | 13.07.2000 | [2001/03] | Priority number, date | DE19991033450 | 16.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19933450 | [2001/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1068900 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1068900 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/08, B01J37/02 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
B01J37/0018 (EP,US);
B01J35/51 (EP,KR);
B01J25/02 (EP);
B01J37/0244 (EP);
B22F1/0655 (EP,US);
C07C209/36 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C209/36, C07C211/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/03] | Title | German: | Aktivierte Raney-Metallkatalysatoren umfassend hohle Formen | [2002/50] | English: | Activated Raney-metal catalysts made of hollow bodies | [2002/50] | French: | Raney-catalyseur activé à base de formes creuses | [2002/50] |
Former [2001/03] | Metallkatalysatoren umfassend hohle Formen | ||
Former [2001/03] | Metal catalysts made of hollow spheres | ||
Former [2001/03] | Catalyseur métallique à base de formes creuses | Examination procedure | 13.07.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 13.07.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 15.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 15.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.04.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 15.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 18.06.2003 | CY | 13.07.2003 | LU | 13.07.2003 | MC | 31.07.2003 | GR | 18.09.2003 | PT | 18.09.2003 | SE | 18.09.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/39] | FI | 18.06.2003 | |
CY | 13.07.2003 | ||
LU | 13.07.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 18.06.2003 | |
CY | 13.07.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 18.06.2003 | |
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | FI | 18.06.2003 | |
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 18.06.2003 | |
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 18.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2172755 (NORTON CO [US]); | [A]DE2353631 (HOECHST AG); | [X]US4576926 (WANG TAYLOR G [US], et al) [X] 1-6,12 * claims 1-5 * * column 5, line 4 - line 13 * * figure 1 * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 9 *; | [X]EP0300543 (NORDDEUTSCHE AFFINERIE [DE]) [X] 1,2,8 * claim 1 * | Examination | EP0880996 |