EP1172148 - Device for and method of reducing rubber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2003 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states New Activation Technology (NAT) AG Aeulestrasse 5 9490 Vaduz / LI | [2002/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Balabekov, Makhmud, Prof. Dr. Nazimahanium 38 Tashkent / UZ | 02 /
Balabekov, Shukhrat Nazimahanium 38 Tashkent / UZ | 03 /
Jovanovic, Djordje Mittlerer Hasenpfad 39 60598 Frankfurt / DE | [2002/03] | Representative(s) | Büchel, Kurt F., et al Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte AG Landstrasse 124 9490 Vaduz / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Büchel, Kurt F., et al Büchel, Kaminski & Partner Patentanwälte Est. Austrasse 79 9490 Vaduz / LI | ||
Former [2002/29] | Büchel, Kurt F., et al Büchel, Kaminski & Partner Austrasse 79 9490 Vaduz / LI | ||
Former [2002/03] | Büchel, Kurt F., Dr. Büchel, Kaminski & Partner, Letzanaweg 25-27 9495 Triesen / LI | Application number, filing date | 00115345.1 | 14.07.2000 | [2002/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1172148 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B02C18/44 | [2002/03] | CPC: |
B02C18/142 (EP);
B02C18/148 (EP);
B02C19/22 (EP);
B29B17/02 (EP);
B29B17/04 (EP);
B02C2201/04 (EP);
B29B2017/0476 (EP);
B29K2021/00 (EP);
B29L2030/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/40] |
Former [2002/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Zerkleinerung von Gummi | [2002/03] | English: | Device for and method of reducing rubber | [2002/03] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour réduction de caoutchouc | [2002/03] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/17] | 15.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.08.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.08.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5590838 (BREWER JOHN C [US]) [A] 1,7,10 * abstract * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5807460 (YAMAMOTO HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1,7,10 * column 14, line 66 - column 15, line 14 * * figure 20 *; | [A]US4012973 (TUPPER MYRON D) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 23 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5487510 (FICKER STEFAN [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 17 - line 36 * | by applicant | SU1353612 | SU1346244 |