EP1071074 - Speech synthesis employing prosody templates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konami Co., Ltd. 3-1, Toranomon 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | For all designated states Konami Computer Entertainment Tokyo Co., Ltd. 3-25, Kanda Jimbocho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0051 / JP | [2007/22] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states Konami Co., Ltd. 3-1, Toranomon 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | ||
For all designated states Konami Computer Entertainment Tokyo Co., Ltd. 3-25, Kanda Jimbocho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0051 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasai, Osamu, c/o Konami Com.Entert., Tokyo Co.Ltd 3-25, Kanda Jinbo-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0051 / JP | 02 /
Mizoguchi, Toshiyuki, Konami Computer Entertainm. Tokyo Co., Ltd.3-25, Kanda Jinbo-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0051 / JP | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 00115590.2 | 19.07.2000 | [2001/04] | Priority number, date | JP19990208606 | 23.07.1999 Original published format: JP 20860699 | [2001/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1071074 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1071074 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | [2001/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1071074 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G10L13/08 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
G10L13/10 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/6063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/44] |
Former [2001/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sprachsynthese mit Prosodie-Mustern | [2001/04] | English: | Speech synthesis employing prosody templates | [2001/04] | French: | Synthèse de la parole utilisant des références de prosodie | [2001/04] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 15.08.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 04.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.09.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2292235 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,6,11 * abstract * * page 1, line 23 - line 29 ** claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP0831460 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 1-3,6-8,11-13 * abstract * | Examination | - LOPEZ-GONZALO E; RODRIGUEZ-GARCIA J M; HERNANDEZ-GOMEZ L; VILLAR J M, "Automatic prosodic modeling for speaker and task adaptation in text-to-speech", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, (19970421), vol. 2, pages 927 - 930, XP010225947 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1997.596088 | - DAMPER ET ALL, "evaluating the pronunciation component of text-to-speech systems for english: a performance comparison of different approaches", COMPUTER SPEECH AND LANGUAGE, uk, (19990401), vol. 31, no. 2, pages 155 - 176, XP004418818 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/csla.1998.0117 | - R.I. DAMPER AND J.F.G. EASTMOND, "pronunciation by analogy: impact of implementational choices of performance", LANGUAGE AND SPEECH, (1997), no. 40, pages 1 - 23, XP007900969 |