EP1056095 - Adjustable output driver circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 S. Federal Way Boise, ID 83707 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 S. Federal Way Boise, ID 83707 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keeth, Brent 5077 North Fifshire Place Boise, Idaho 83713 / US | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Peter Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | Hirsch, Peter Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00115868.2 | 18.12.1997 | [2000/48] | Priority number, date | US19970779344 | 06.01.1997 Original published format: US 779344 | [2000/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1056095 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1056095 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | [2000/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1056095 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/10, H03K17/16 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
H03K17/164 (EP,US);
G11C7/00 (KR);
G11C7/1051 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/48] | G11C7/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/48] | Title | German: | Einstellbare Ausgangstreiberschaltung | [2000/48] | English: | Adjustable output driver circuit | [2000/48] | French: | Circuit d'attaque de sortie ajustable | [2000/48] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 25.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97953418.7 / EP0950247 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.11.2002 | BE | 06.11.2002 | CH | 06.11.2002 | FI | 06.11.2002 | FR | 06.11.2002 | GR | 06.11.2002 | LI | 06.11.2002 | NL | 06.11.2002 | IE | 18.12.2002 | LU | 18.12.2002 | DK | 06.02.2003 | PT | 06.02.2003 | SE | 06.02.2003 | ES | 29.05.2003 | MC | 01.07.2003 | [2007/26] |
Former [2007/10] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
BE | 06.11.2002 | ||
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
FI | 06.11.2002 | ||
FR | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
IE | 18.12.2002 | ||
DK | 06.02.2003 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
MC | 01.07.2003 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
BE | 06.11.2002 | ||
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
FI | 06.11.2002 | ||
FR | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
IE | 18.12.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
MC | 01.07.2003 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
BE | 06.11.2002 | ||
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
FI | 06.11.2002 | ||
FR | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
IE | 18.12.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/18] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
BE | 06.11.2002 | ||
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
FI | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
IE | 18.12.2002 | ||
LU | 06.01.2003 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
BE | 06.11.2002 | ||
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
FI | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
IE | 18.12.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
BE | 06.11.2002 | ||
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
FI | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
IE | 18.12.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
BE | 06.11.2002 | ||
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
FI | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
FI | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 06.11.2002 | |
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 06.11.2002 | |
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 06.02.2003 | |
SE | 06.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/19] | SE | 06.02.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0340731 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,11* abstract *; | [A]EP0599631 (INMOS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document * |