EP1096181 - Multi-layered cylinder head gasket with external layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Federal -Mogul Sealing Systems GmbH Hermann-Goetze-Strasse 57562 Herdorf / DE | [2001/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heilig, Markus Sandersgarten 4 57518 Betzdorf / DE | 02 /
Retiere, Alain Eibenweg 11 40629 Erkrath / DE | 03 /
Klinner, Manfred Evrystrasse 46a 53844 Troisdorf / DE | [2004/38] |
Former [2004/30] | 01 /
Heilig, Markus Sandersgarten 4 57518 Betzdorf / DE | ||
02 /
Retiere, Alain Eibeweg 11 40629 Erkrath / DE | |||
03 /
Klinner, Manfred Evrystrasse 46a 53844 Troisdorf / DE | |||
Former [2004/22] | 01 /
Heilig, Markus Sandersgarten 4 57518 Betzdorf / DE | ||
02 /
Retiere, Alain Eibeweg 11 40629 Erkrath / DE | |||
03 /
Klinner, Manfred Evrystrasse 46atrasse 53844 Troisdorf / DE | |||
Former [2001/18] | 01 /
Heilig, Markus Hermann-Götze-Strasse 57562 Herdorf / DE | ||
02 /
Retiere, Alain Hermann-Götze-Strasse 57562 Herdorf / DE | |||
03 /
Klinner, Manfred Hermann-Götze-Strasse 57562 Herdorf / DE | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00115944.1 | 25.07.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | DE19991051530 | 26.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19951530 | [2001/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1096181 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1096181 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | [2003/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1096181 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/08 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
F16J15/0825 (EP);
F16J2015/0837 (EP);
F16J2015/0856 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/42] |
Former [2001/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mehrlagige Zylinderkopfdichtung mit Aussenlage | [2001/18] | English: | Multi-layered cylinder head gasket with external layer | [2001/18] | French: | Joint de culasse à couches multiples comportant une couche externe | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 28.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.11.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 24.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.09.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4325559 (CZERNIK DANIEL E, et al) [X] 1-4,14 * column A; figure 3 * * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 5 *; | [X]JPS61160549 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861206), vol. 010, no. 365, Database accession no. (M - 542), & JP61160549 A 19860721 (NIPPON RAINTSU KK) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * figures 6,7 * | by applicant | JPS62206258 | US5280929 | US4898396 | US5161809 |