EP1084662 - Cupboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nolte-Küchen GmbH & Co. KG Windmühlenweg 153 32584 Löhne / DE | [2001/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schöckinghoff, Josef Buchenhain 6 32584 Löhne / DE | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Elbertzhagen, Otto, et al Patentanwälte Thielking & Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 14 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Elbertzhagen, Otto, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Thielking & Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 14 33602 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2001/12] | Thielking, Bodo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Gadderbaumer Strasse 14 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 00116084.5 | 27.07.2000 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | DE1999216250U | 17.09.1999 Original published format: DE 29916250 U | [2001/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1084662 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1084662 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A47B95/04, A47B97/00 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
A47B95/043 (EP);
A47B88/963 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, LU, NL [2001/50] |
Former [2001/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kastenmöbelstück | [2001/12] | English: | Cupboard | [2001/12] | French: | Placard | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 16.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 03.03.2004 | IT | 03.03.2004 | NL | 03.03.2004 | LU | 27.07.2004 | BE | 31.07.2004 | [2007/35] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 03.03.2004 | |
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
LU | 27.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | NL | 03.03.2004 | |
LU | 27.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | NL | 03.03.2004 | |
LU | 27.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/05] | NL | 03.03.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9317214 (NEFF KITCHEN MFG LTD [CA]) [A] 1,2 * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 2 * * claim 7 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19545275 (ESCHEBACH KUECHENMOEBEL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 9 * * claims 1-8 * * figure - *; | [A]US4810550 (GASSER MARK E [US]) [A] 1,2 * claim 1 * * figure - * | by applicant | DE29805839U |