EP1113522 - Coupling structure of waveguide and applicator, and its application to electrodeless lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Ku Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong, Yongdungpo-Ku Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2001/27] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong, Yongdungpo-Ku Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Han-Seok Bosung Apt. 102-705, 442 Mapo-Dong, Mapo-Ku, KR-Seoul / KR | 02 /
Choi, Joon-Sik Kangbyunchunggoo Apt. 101-2007 Sungsoo2ga 1-Dong, Sungdong-Ku, KR-Seoul / KR | [2001/27] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 00116103.3 | 28.07.2000 | [2001/27] | Priority number, date | KR19990064807 | 29.12.1999 Original published format: KR 9964807 | [2001/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1113522 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1113522 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1113522 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01P5/18 | [2001/27] | CPC: |
H01P5/181 (EP,US);
H01J65/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [2003/08] |
Former [2001/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Koppelstruktur für Hohlleiter und Applikator und dessen Verwendung für eine elektrodenlose Lampe | [2001/27] | English: | Coupling structure of waveguide and applicator, and its application to electrodeless lamp | [2001/27] | French: | Structure de connexion entre guide d' ondes et applicateur et son application à une lampe sans électrodes | [2001/27] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 30.11.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.03.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT | 03.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.01.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.01.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.01.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.01.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.01.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.01.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.01.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.01.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.01.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.01.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.01.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.01.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.01.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.01.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.01.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3745292 (COUASNARD C) [A] 1,8,16 * column W *; | [A]US5370765 (DANDL RAPHAEL A [US]) [A] 1,8,16 * column 8, line 36 - column 9, line 5; figure 6 *; | [A]US5521360 (JOHNSON ARVID C [US], et al) [A] 1,8,16 * column 10, line 40 - column 11, line 30; figure 2 *; | [A]US5538699 (SUZUKI NOBUMASA [JP]) [A] 1,8,16 * column 12, line 44 - column 13, line 14; figures 1A,B,2A *; | [A]US5975014 (DANDL RAPHAEL A [US]) [A] 1,8,16* column 13, lines 7-18; figures 2,4A,B * |