EP1178438 - Method ad system for automatically testing the assemblability of a product built from of several computer manufactured parts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tecoplan AG Einsteinstrasse 30 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [2002/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baginski, Boris, Dr. Chopinstrasse 28 81245 München / DE | 02 /
Schnaus, Oliver Kondorstrasse 7 85630 Grasbrunn / DE | 03 /
Schneidewind, Bernd Buchenstrasse, 9 85640 Putzbrunn / DE | 04 /
Thomson, Norman Waldstrasse 32 85540 Haar / DE | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00116198.3 | 03.08.2000 | [2002/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1178438 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06T17/00 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
G06T19/00 (EP);
G05B19/41805 (EP);
G06F30/00 (EP);
G05B2219/31044 (EP);
G05B2219/32084 (EP);
G05B2219/32126 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/43] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum automatischen Überprüfen der Baubarkeit eines aus mehreren rechnergestützt konstruierten Bauteilen bestehenden Gesamtprodukts | [2002/06] | English: | Method ad system for automatically testing the assemblability of a product built from of several computer manufactured parts | [2002/06] | French: | Procédé et système pour l'évaluation automatique de l'assemblage d'un produit comportant plusieurs parties fabriquées par ordinateur | [2002/06] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/19] | 03.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.09.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.09.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.09.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.09.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.09.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.09.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.09.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.09.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.09.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.09.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.09.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.09.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.09.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.09.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.09.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.09.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.09.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.09.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.09.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5864482 (HAZAMA KENSUKE [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * abstract * * column 4, line 20 - line 60 * * column 7, line 26 - line 40 *; | [A]GB2325996 (LSI LOGIC CORP [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 19 *; | [A]JP2000057379 ; | [Y] - ERKES J W ET AL, "IMPLEMENTING SHARED MANUFACTURING SERVICES ON THE WORLD-WIDE WEB", COMMUNICATIONS OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY,US,ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY. NEW YORK, (19960201), vol. 39, no. 2, ISSN 0001-0782, pages 34 - 45, XP000585177 [Y] 1-21 * abstract * * page 34, column L, line 1 - page 35, column L, line 25 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/230798.230802 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000914), vol. 2000, no. 05, & JP2000057379 A 20000225 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-21 * abstract * | [A] - PARK S ET AL, "Verification of assemblability between toleranced parts", COMPUTER AIDED DESIGN,GB,ELSEVIER PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, (19980201), vol. 30, no. 2, ISSN 0010-4485, pages 95 - 104, XP004116606 [A] 1-21 * abstract * * page 95, paragraph INTRODUCTION * * page 97, paragraph ASSEMBLABILITY * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0010-4485(97)00008-0 |