EP1083259 - Headbox [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2001/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heinzmann, Helmut Baierstrasse 29 89558 Böhmenkirch / DE | 02 /
Heuser, Udo Hirschhaldeweg 16 89555 Steinheim / DE | [2001/11] | Application number, filing date | 00116670.1 | 02.08.2000 | [2001/11] | Priority number, date | DE1999137302 | 10.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19937302 | [2001/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1083259 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1083259 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | [2001/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1083259 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/02 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
D21F1/02 (EP);
D21F1/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, SE [2002/05] |
Former [2001/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stoffauflauf | [2001/11] | English: | Headbox | [2001/11] | French: | Caisse de tête | [2001/11] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 01.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE4310223 (ESCHER WYSS GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,4,6,8 * column A; figure - * |