EP1076459 - Data transfer system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. 6501 William Cannon Drive West Austin, TX 78735 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. 6501 William Cannon Drive West Austin, Texas 78735 / US | ||
Former [2001/07] | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buttar, Alistair 1 Chemin Des Frenes Tannay 1295 / CH | 02 /
Soudagar, Salma 17 Rue Froide 1296 Coppet / CH | 03 /
Duc, Benoit 19 Avenue Edouard Dapples 1006 Lausanne / CH | [2001/13] |
Former [2001/07] | 01 /
Buttar, Alistair 1 Chemin Des Frenes Tannay 1295 / CH | ||
02 /
Soudagar, Salma 18 Rue Froide 1296 Coppet / CH | |||
03 /
Duc, Benoit 18 De la Foret 1024 / CH | Representative(s) | Wharmby, Martin Angus Freescale Semiconductor Inc. c/o Impetus IP Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Wharmby, Martin Angus Freescale Semiconductor Inc. c/o Impetus IP Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | ||
Former [2001/07] | Gibson, Sarah Jane, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00117007.5 | 08.08.2000 | [2001/07] | Priority number, date | GB19990018584 | 09.08.1999 Original published format: GB 9918584 | [2001/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1076459 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1076459 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24, H04L29/06 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
H04N21/818 (EP);
H04N21/2343 (EP);
H04N21/2662 (EP);
H04N21/44245 (EP);
H04N21/6582 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/07] | H04N7/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2005/17] |
Former [2001/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Datenübertragung | [2001/07] | English: | Data transfer system and method | [2001/07] | French: | Système et méthode pour le transfert de données | [2001/07] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 09.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/13] | 27.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9837698 (ADAPTIVE MEDIA TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 4 * * page 5, line 3 - line 14 * * page 6, line 28 - page 8, line 33 * * page 19, line 12 - page 25, line 12 * * page 28, line 25 - page 31, line 11 * * page 33, line 25 - line 30 * * claims 1-80 * * figures 1,2A,2B,5,7A-7D,12-16A3,18C *; | [X] - GORMISH MICHAEL J, "JPEG 2000: worth the wait?", IEEE CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, (19990808), vol. 2, pages 766 - 769, XP010511064 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 766, column L, paragraph 3 - column R, paragraph 2 * * page 767, column L, paragraph 4 - column R, paragraph 1 * * page 767, column R, paragraph 7 * * page 768, column L, paragraphs 2,6 * * page 768, column R, paragraphs 1,4 * * page 769, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 769, column R, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,2; table I * | [A] - FOX A ET AL, "ADAPTING TO NETWORK AND CLIENT VARIABILITY VIA ON-DEMAND DYNAMIC DISTILLATION", ACM SIGPLAN NOTICES, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, NEW YORK, US, (19960901), vol. 31, no. 9, ISSN 0362-1340, pages 160 - 170, XP000639230 [A] 1-5,10 * page 160 - page 164 * * page 168 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/248209.237177 | [A] - MOHAN R ET AL, "Adapting multimedia Internet content for universal access", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MULTIMEDIA, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (199903), vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 1520-9210, pages 104 - 114, XP002159629 [A] 1-5,9,10 * page 104, column L, paragraph 1 - page 108, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 110, column R, paragraph L - page 111, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 112, column L, paragraph 3 * * figures 1-3,5,6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/6046.748175 | [A] - CHARRIER M ET AL, "JPEG2000, the next millennium compression standard for still images", MULTIMEDIA COMPUTING AND SYSTEMS, 1999. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON FLORENCE, ITALY 7-11 JUNE 1999, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19990607), ISBN 0-7695-0253-9, pages 131 - 132, XP010342850 [A] 1,2,4,6,9,10 * abstract * * page 131, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 132, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MMCS.1999.779134 | [A] - LIANG J ET AL, "TOOLS FOR ROBUST IMAGE AND VIDEO CODING IN JPEG 2000 AND MPEG4 STANDARDS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (199901), vol. 3653, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 40 - 51, XP000933619 [A] 1,2,5 * page 41, paragraph 3 - page 44, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.334689 |