EP1077475 - Method of micromachining a multi-part cavity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Podlesnik, Dragan V. 1736 San Creek Drive, Apt. 209 Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 02 /
Chinn, Jeffrey D. 605 St. Croix Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 03 /
Lill, Thorsten B. 880 East Fremont, Apt. 634 Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 04 /
Pan, Shaoher X. 1133 Kelez Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 05 /
Khan, Anisul 125 Connemare Way, Apt. 81 Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 06 /
Wang, Joan Yiqiong 2678 Calico Ct. Morgan Hill, CA 95037 / US | 07 /
Li, Maocheng 725 Honda Way Fremont, CA 94539 / US | [2001/08] | Representative(s) | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, et al Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, et al Puschmann & Borchert Patentanwälte Bajuwarenring 21 82041 Oberhaching / DE | ||
Former [2006/40] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, et al Kirschner Patentanwaltskanzlei Südliche Münchnerstrasse 53 82031 Grünwald / DE | ||
Former [2001/08] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Phys. Schneiders & Behrendt Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Sollner Strasse 38 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00117155.2 | 10.08.2000 | [2001/08] | Priority number, date | US19990372477 | 11.08.1999 Original published format: US 372477 | [2001/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1077475 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1077475 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/3065, B81C1/00, H01L21/308, H01L21/768 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
H01L21/3065 (EP,US);
H10B12/0387 (EP,US);
B81C1/00119 (EP,US);
H01L21/3086 (EP,US);
B81B2201/052 (EP,US);
B81B2203/0315 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/08] | H01L21/3065, B81C1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/01] |
Former [2001/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Mikrobearbeitung einer Körperhölung mit mehrfachem Profil | [2001/08] | English: | Method of micromachining a multi-part cavity | [2001/08] | French: | Méthode pour la microfabrication d'une cavité à profil complexe | [2001/08] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/49] | 06.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/47] | 25.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH06177264 ; | [X]US4472240 (KAMEYAMA SHUICHI [JP]); | [X]EP0540262 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [US]); | [XY]WO9418697 (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US]); | [A]EP0680085 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]); | [X]EP0729175 (IBM [US]); | [Y]US5635423 (HUANG RICHARD J [US], et al); | [X]US5686354 (AVANZINO STEVEN [US], et al); | [X]EP0822582 (SURFACE TECH SYS LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0862222 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]); | [A]US5916823 (LOU CHINE-GIE [TW], et al); | [E]EP1049157 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) |