EP1077139 - Image printing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawazoe, Kenji, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2001/08] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/38] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o TBK-Patent, P.O. Box 20 19 18 80019 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/08] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00117185.9 | 10.08.2000 | [2001/08] | Priority number, date | JP19990227942 | 11.08.1999 Original published format: JP 22794299 | JP20000217757 | 18.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000217757 | [2001/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1077139 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1077139 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41J19/20 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
B41J19/202 (EP,US);
B41J29/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/08] | B41J29/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/19] |
Former [2001/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bilddruckapparat | [2001/08] | English: | Image printing apparatus | [2001/08] | French: | Appareil d'impression d'images | [2001/08] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 02.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS62226007 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [X] 1,2,6,7 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0300823 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,2 * figures 2,3 * * column 7, line 4 - line 40 *; | [DXY]US5450106 (MORIOKA HISASHI [JP], et al) [DX] 1,2,4,6-9 * figures 15-18 * * column 6, line 47 - column 7, line 25 * [Y] 13-16; | [Y]EP0841168 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 13-16* abstract * | by applicant | US4313124 | US4345262 | US4463359 | US4558333 | US4723129 | US4740796 | JPH05298628 | US5450106 |