EP1085230 - Brake disc [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [2001/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Veith, Christoph Im Gruehl 40 61476 Kronberg / DE | 02 /
Beer, Wilhelm Merowinger Ring 23 65428 Rüsselsheim / DE | [2001/12] | Application number, filing date | 00117219.6 | 11.08.2000 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | DE1999143893 | 14.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19943893 | [2001/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1085230 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1085230 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/12 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
F16D65/12 (EP);
F16D2065/1308 (EP);
F16D2065/1328 (EP);
F16D2069/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/50] |
Former [2001/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bremsscheibe | [2001/12] | English: | Brake disc | [2001/12] | French: | Disque de frein | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 15.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.05.2005 | GB | 04.05.2005 | IT | 04.05.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | GB | 04.05.2005 | |
IT | 04.05.2005 | ||
FR | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2007/35] | GB | 04.05.2005 | |
IT | 04.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | GB | 04.05.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2698142 (ENGRENAGES STE EUROP [FR]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]EP0811783 (RENAULT VEHICULES IND [FR]) [A] 1,4 * abstract *; | [A]DE2458048 (PORSCHE AG) [A] 1,5,6 * page 3, paragraph L * * page 4, paragraph L; figure - *; | [A]DE2450151 (INST SCHIENENFAHRZEUGE) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2308256 (PORSCHE AG) [A] 5,6 * page 3, paragraph 4; figures 1,4 * |