EP1076035 - Pressure swing adsorption process for the production of hydrogen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, CT 06810-5113 / US | [2017/25] |
Former [2001/07] | For all designated states PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, CT 06810-5113 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baksh, Mohamed Safdar Allie 2635 Sweet Home Road Amherst, New York 14228 / US | 02 /
Ackley, Mark william 96 Church Street East Aurora, New York 14052 / US | [2001/07] | Representative(s) | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/25] | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/07] | Schorer, Reinhard, et al Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Elfenstrasse 32 81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00117437.4 | 11.08.2000 | [2001/07] | Priority number, date | US19990373749 | 13.08.1999 Original published format: US 373749 | [2001/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1076035 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1076035 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | [2003/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1076035 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1076035 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/56, B01D53/047 | [2001/07] | CPC: |
B01D53/047 (EP,US);
C01B3/50 (KR);
C01B3/56 (EP,US);
B01D2253/102 (EP,US);
B01D2253/104 (EP,US);
B01D2253/1085 (EP,US);
B01D2256/16 (EP,US);
B01D2257/102 (EP,US);
B01D2257/2066 (EP,US);
B01D2257/502 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
B01D2257/7025 (EP,US);
B01D2257/80 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40015 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40024 (EP,US);
B01D2259/4003 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40041 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40052 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40075 (EP,US);
B01D2259/404 (EP,US);
B01D2259/4146 (EP,US);
B01D53/02 (EP,US);
B01D53/261 (EP,US);
C01B2203/043 (EP,US);
C01B2203/047 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0475 (EP,US);
C01B2203/048 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0495 (EP,US);
Y02C20/20 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2017/25] |
Former [2004/09] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2001/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Druckwechseladsorptionsverfahren für die Herstellung von Wasserstoff | [2001/07] | English: | Pressure swing adsorption process for the production of hydrogen | [2001/07] | French: | Procédé d'adsorption modulée en pression pour la production d'hydrogène | [2001/07] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 14.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 30.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.12.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.10.2014 | Observations by third parties | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.08.2010
11.08.2010
ADMISSIBLE L AIR LIQUIDE SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L ETUDE ET L EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75 Quai d'Orsay 75007 PARIS / FR Opponent's representative Laigneau, Amandine L'Air Liquide Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.08.2010
11.08.2010
ADMISSIBLE L AIR LIQUIDE SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L ETUDE ET L EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75 Quai d'Orsay 75007 PARIS / FR Opponent's representative Beroud, Amandine L'air Liquide Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 75, quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 22.09.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.01.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.02.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.02.2012 | 29.02.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.03.2012 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 19.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M01) | 28.10.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.11.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 15.05.2017 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 16.05.2012 | Appeal received No. T1181/12 | 17.07.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.10.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 09.10.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.10.2015 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 09.10.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 09.10.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.10.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 11.08.2012 | [2013/34] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4477267 (REISS GERHARD [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * column 1, line 31 - line 37; figure 1; claims 1,2,6,7 * * column 3, line 3 - line 11 * * column 4, line 29 - line 32 * [Y] 8; | [YA]GB2155805 (OSAKA OXYGEN IND) [Y] 8 * page 1, line 44 - line 52; figures 1,2 * * page 3, line 8 - line 13 * [A] 1-7,10; | [A]US3720042 (SIMONET G) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 26 - line 36 * | by applicant | US3430418 | US3564816 | US4171206 | GB2155805 | US3313091 | US4481018 | US5698013 | US5454857 | other | EP0923976 | EP0832678 | EP0078966 | Opposition | EP0923976 | EP0832678 | EP0078966 | US2882244 |