EP1108432 - Method for identifying or isolating a molecule [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/25] | Method for identifying or isolating a molecule and molecules indentified thereby | ||
[2002/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUDWIG INSTITUTE FOR CANCER RESEARCH 605 Third Avenue New York New York 10158 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | For all designated states LUDWIG INSTITUTE FOR CANCER RESEARCH 605 Third Avenue New York, New York 10158 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfreundschuh, Michael Innere Medizin 1 Universität Medizin 1 Universität des Saarlandes 66421 Homburg / DE | [2001/25] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | Harrison Goddard Foote Tower House, Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00117699.9 | 07.06.1996 | [2001/25] | Priority number, date | US19950479328 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 479328 | US19960580980 | 03.01.1996 Original published format: US 580980 | US19960644116 | 10.05.1996 Original published format: US 644116 | [2001/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1108432 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1108432 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/08, C07K7/00, C12Q1/68, G01N33/53 | [2001/25] | CPC: |
G01N33/57484 (EP,US);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C07K14/4748 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6811 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
G01N33/56977 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Identifizierung und Isolierung von einem Molekül | [2002/28] | English: | Method for identifying or isolating a molecule | [2002/28] | French: | Procédé d'identification ou d'isolation d'une molécule | [2002/28] |
Former [2001/25] | Verfahren zur Identifizierung und Isolierung von einem Molekül und von diesem erkannte Moleküle | ||
Former [2001/25] | Method for identifying or isolating a molecule and molecules indentified thereby | ||
Former [2001/25] | Procédé d'identification ou d'isolation d'une molécule et molécules ainsi identifiées | Examination procedure | 17.08.2000 | Examination requested [2001/38] | 30.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96919266.5 / EP0831879 | Divisional application(s) | EP02021101.7 / EP1295896 | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   13.08.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.03.2003 | BE | 26.03.2003 | CH | 26.03.2003 | FI | 26.03.2003 | GR | 26.03.2003 | IT | 26.03.2003 | LI | 26.03.2003 | NL | 26.03.2003 | LU | 07.06.2003 | IE | 09.06.2003 | DK | 26.06.2003 | PT | 26.06.2003 | SE | 26.06.2003 | MC | 30.06.2003 | ES | 30.09.2003 | [2007/35] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 26.03.2003 | |
BE | 26.03.2003 | ||
CH | 26.03.2003 | ||
FI | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
LI | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
LU | 07.06.2003 | ||
IE | 09.06.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
MC | 30.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 26.03.2003 | |
BE | 26.03.2003 | ||
CH | 26.03.2003 | ||
FI | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
LI | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
LU | 07.06.2003 | ||
IE | 09.06.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 26.03.2003 | |
BE | 26.03.2003 | ||
CH | 26.03.2003 | ||
FI | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
LI | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
IE | 09.06.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 26.03.2003 | |
BE | 26.03.2003 | ||
CH | 26.03.2003 | ||
FI | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
LI | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 26.03.2003 | |
BE | 26.03.2003 | ||
CH | 26.03.2003 | ||
FI | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
LI | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 26.03.2003 | |
CH | 26.03.2003 | ||
FI | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
LI | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | AT | 26.03.2003 | |
CH | 26.03.2003 | ||
FI | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
LI | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | AT | 26.03.2003 | |
FI | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 26.03.2003 | |
FI | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 26.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9420127 (CYTEL CORP [US]); | [A]WO9514772 (MATSUBARA KENICHI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0285123 (SUOMEN SOKERI OY [FI]); | [A]EP0204922 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) | [PX] - SAHIN ET AL, "Human neoplasms elicit multiple specific immune responses in the autologous host", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA,US,NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, vol. 92, page 11810-11813, XP002091914 [PX] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.25.11810 |