EP1077054 - Absorbent article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2005 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states First Quality Enterprises, Inc. Clinton County Industrial Park, North Road McElhattan, Pennsylvania 17748 / US | [2001/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Damaghi, Kambiz 9 Farmers Road Kings Point, New York 11021 / US | 02 /
Turi, Mordechai P.O. Box 383 Conyngham, PA 18219 / US | 03 /
Kauschke, Michael 1116 Warburton Avenue Yonkers, New York 10701 / US | 04 /
Karami, Hamzeh P.O. Box 252 McElhattan, PA 17748 / US | [2001/08] | Representative(s) | Motsch, Andreas Patentanwalt St-Anna-Platz 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | Motsch, Andreas Patentanwalt St-Anna-Platz 4 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00117745.0 | 17.08.2000 | [2001/08] | Priority number, date | US19990376282 | 18.08.1999 Original published format: US 376282 | [2001/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1077054 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1077054 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/49, A61F13/64, A61F13/56, A61F13/15 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
A61F13/49 (EP);
A61F13/5655 (EP);
A61F13/64 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/08] | A61F13/49, A61F13/64 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/08] | Title | German: | Absorbierender Artikel | [2001/08] | English: | Absorbent article | [2001/08] | French: | Article absorbant | [2001/08] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 01.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/35] | 04.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0985398 (FIRST QUALITY PRODUCTS INC [US]) [PX] 1-14 * figures 1-22; claims 1-14 *; | [X]EP0832628 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,13,14 * column 5, line 10 - column 9, line 40 * * column 12, line 4 - column 13, line 5 * * figures 1-6 *; | [X]US5137526 (COATES FREDRICA [US]) [X] 1-14 * column 8, line 4 - column 9, line 43 * * figures 1-18 *; | [X]EP0528282 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,13-22 * column 5, line 27 - column 6, line 26 * * figures 1-8 *; | [X]US5445628 (GIPSON WILLIAM P [US], et al) [X] 20-22 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]GB2263224 (FENTON JACQUELINE ANNE MARGARE [GB]) [X] 15,20 * figures 1-7 *; | [X]US5906604 (ROENNBERG PETER [SE], et al) [X] 20 * figures 1-7 *; | [X]US4675918 (O'BRIEN ANN N [US]) [X] 23-26 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]GB888827 (MARGIT FUCHS, et al) [A] 23 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5695488 (SOSALLA PAULA MARY [US]) [A] 23 * figures 7-11 *; | [A]US2493113 (GELIMANN DANCE BARBARA) [A] 23 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4995873 (KNIGHT JACKILYN M [AU]) [A] 23 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5368585 (DOKKEN GLENDA K [US]) [A] 23 * figures 1-4 * |