EP1186453 - Side intrusion beam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BENTELER AG Residenzstrasse 1 D-33104 Paderborn / DE | [2002/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gehringhoff, Ludger, . Dipl.- Ing. Tulpenweg 34 33106 Paderborn- Sande / DE | 02 /
Schäfers, Johannes, . Dipl.-Ing. Schulstr. 7 33178 Borchen / DE | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Ksoll, Peter Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Ksoll, Peter, Dr.-Ing. Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 00117869.8 | 19.08.2000 | [2002/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1186453 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1186453 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60J5/04 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
B60J5/0437 (EP,US);
B60J5/0444 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/11] | Title | German: | Seitenaufprallträger | [2002/11] | English: | Side intrusion beam | [2002/11] | French: | Poutre d'enfoncement latéral | [2002/11] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2000 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 30.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 08.01.2003 | GB | 08.01.2003 | GR | 08.01.2003 | IE | 08.01.2003 | NL | 08.01.2003 | DK | 08.04.2003 | PT | 08.04.2003 | SE | 08.04.2003 | ES | 30.07.2003 | AT | 19.08.2003 | CY | 19.08.2003 | LU | 19.08.2003 | BE | 31.08.2003 | MC | 31.08.2003 | [2005/11] |
Former [2005/02] | FI | 08.01.2003 | |
GB | 08.01.2003 | ||
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
IE | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 08.04.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
CY | 19.08.2003 | ||
LU | 19.08.2003 | ||
BE | 31.08.2003 | ||
MC | 31.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/52] | FI | 08.01.2003 | |
GB | 08.01.2003 | ||
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
IE | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 08.04.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
CY | 19.08.2003 | ||
LU | 19.08.2003 | ||
BE | 31.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 08.01.2003 | |
GB | 08.01.2003 | ||
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
IE | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 08.04.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
CY | 19.08.2003 | ||
LU | 19.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 08.01.2003 | |
GB | 08.01.2003 | ||
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
IE | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 08.04.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
CY | 19.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | FI | 08.01.2003 | |
GB | 08.01.2003 | ||
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
IE | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 08.04.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | FI | 08.01.2003 | |
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
IE | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 08.04.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | FI | 08.01.2003 | |
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
IE | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 08.04.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | FI | 08.01.2003 | |
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
IE | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 08.01.2003 | |
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 08.01.2003 | |
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 08.01.2003 | |
NL | 08.01.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 08.04.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1287160 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 38 - line 72; figure 1 *; | [A]US5000509 (SINNHUBER RUPRECHT [DE], et al) [A] 1* column 3, line 12 - line 21; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE4342038 (GO GIOK DJIEN DR ING [DE]) [A] 1,7 * figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [YDA]EP0662053 (PLANNJA HARDTECH AB [SE]) [YD] 1,2 * column 3, line 33 - column 5, line 2; figures 1-4F * [A] 3-5; | [DA]EP0728607 (YAMAKAWA IND CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1002680 (BENTELER WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * column 4, line 6 - line 21; figure 2 * | by applicant | EP0662053 | EP0728607 |