EP1081098 - Filtration and purification for aqueous acids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/10] | Filtration and purification system for aqueous acids | ||
[2004/39] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mykrolis Corporation Patriots Park Bedford, MA 01730 / US | [2002/36] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states MILLIPORE CORPORATION 80 Ashby Road Bedford Massachusetts 01730 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bruening, Ronald L. 1586 East 450 South Springville, UT 84663 / US | 02 /
Dileo, Anthony J. 13 Vose Road Westford, MA 01886 / US | 03 /
Deane, Edward P.O. Box 58 Newton Junction, NH 03859-0058 / US | 04 /
Parekh, Bipin S. 2 Dastrake Place Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00117948.0 | 21.08.2000 | [2001/10] | Priority number, date | US19990383055 | 25.08.1999 Original published format: US 383055 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1081098 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/62, C01B7/19, B01D67/00 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
B01D67/00931 (EP,KR,US);
B01D61/00 (EP,KR,US);
B01D61/145 (EP,US);
B01D61/147 (EP,US);
C01B7/197 (EP,US);
B01D2323/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/48] |
Former [2001/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Reinigung und Filtrations von wässrigen Säuren | [2004/39] | English: | Filtration and purification for aqueous acids | [2004/39] | French: | Purification et filtration de solutions aqueuses d'acides | [2004/39] |
Former [2001/10] | Reinigungs- und Filtrationssystem von wässrigen Säuren | ||
Former [2001/10] | Filtration and purification system for aqueous acids | ||
Former [2001/10] | Système de purification et de filtration de solutions aqueuses d'acides | Examination procedure | 21.08.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 30.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 17.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/30] | 22.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0724314 ; | [X]US5087372 (TOYOMOTO KAZUO [JP], et al); | [XD]US5547760 (TARBET BRYON J [US], et al); |