EP1079453 - Sealing structure of cell tube for a tubular type fuel cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/24] |
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsukuda, Hiroshi, Nagaski Research & Devel.Center Mitsubishi Heavy Ind.,Ltd.,717-1,Fukahori-machi 5-chome, Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki / JP | 02 /
Hisatome, Nagao, Nagasaki Shipyard&Machinery Works Mitsubishi Heavy Ind.,Ltd., 1-1, Akunoura-machi Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Yoshiharu, Nagasaki Shipy.&Machin.Works Mitsubishi Heavy Ind.,Ltd., 1-1, Akunoura-machi Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki / JP | 04 /
Houjyou, Toru, Choryo Enigineering Co., Ltd. 717-1, Fukahori-machi 5-chome Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki / JP | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | Grünberg, Thomas, et al Advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | Grünberg, Thomas, et al advotec. Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 4 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/09] | Kern, Ralf M., Dipl.-Ing. Hansastrasse 16/II. 80686 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00117954.8 | 21.08.2000 | [2001/09] | Priority number, date | JP19990235329 | 23.08.1999 Original published format: JP 23532999 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1079453 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1079453 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | [2005/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1079453 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, H01M8/12 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
H01M8/0271 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1293 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0074 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2005/52] |
Former [2001/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Dichtungsanordnung einer Rohrzelle für eine rohrförmige Brennstoffzelle | [2001/09] | English: | Sealing structure of cell tube for a tubular type fuel cell | [2001/09] | French: | Structure d'étanchéité d'une cellule tubulaire pour une pile à combustible de type tubulaire | [2001/09] | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 13.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 15.02.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 30.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 13.06.2007 | [2008/09] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0414766 ; | [A]JPH05234607 ; | [A]JPH0633282 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920422), vol. 016, no. 166, Database accession no. (E - 1193), & JP04014766 A 19920120 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931215), vol. 017, no. 683, Database accession no. (E - 1477), & JP05234607 A 19930910 (MURATA MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940517), vol. 018, no. 257, Database accession no. (C - 1200), & JP06033282 A 19940208 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * |