EP1083284 - Door handle arrangement for vehicle doorlocksystem with passive entry function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brose Schliesssysteme GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Strasse 42 42369 Wuppertal / DE | [2003/41] |
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weyerstall, Bernd Schenkstrasse 83 42369 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
Gerhardt, Christian Nordstrasse 48 45525 Hattingen / DE | [2001/11] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2003/15] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00117963.9 | 22.08.2000 | [2001/11] | Priority number, date | DE19991042481 | 07.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19942481 | [2001/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1083284 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1083284 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/20 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
E05B85/10 (EP);
E05B77/42 (EP);
E05B81/78 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/11] | Title | German: | Türgriffanordnung für ein Kraftfahrzeug-Türschliesssystem mit Passive Entry-Funktion | [2001/11] | English: | Door handle arrangement for vehicle doorlocksystem with passive entry function | [2001/11] | French: | Dispositif de poignée de porte de véhicule pour une système de verrouillage de porte de véhicule avec fonction d'ouverture sans clef | [2001/11] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 22.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.03.2004 | FI | 10.03.2004 | IE | 10.03.2004 | NL | 10.03.2004 | DK | 10.06.2004 | GR | 10.06.2004 | SE | 10.06.2004 | PT | 10.08.2004 | AT | 22.08.2004 | LU | 22.08.2004 | BE | 31.08.2004 | CH | 31.08.2004 | LI | 31.08.2004 | MC | 31.08.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | CY | 10.03.2004 | |
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
IE | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
AT | 22.08.2004 | ||
LU | 22.08.2004 | ||
BE | 31.08.2004 | ||
CH | 31.08.2004 | ||
LI | 31.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
IE | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
AT | 22.08.2004 | ||
BE | 31.08.2004 | ||
CH | 31.08.2004 | ||
LI | 31.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
IE | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
BE | 31.08.2004 | ||
CH | 31.08.2004 | ||
LI | 31.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/25] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
IE | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
CH | 31.08.2004 | ||
LI | 31.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
IE | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
IE | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/05] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
IE | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
IE | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
SE | 10.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19521024 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 16 - line 58 *; | [X]EP0916789 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,8 * column 1, line 25 - column 3, line 5; figure - *; | [X]EP0927803 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,6,8 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 40 * * column 6, line 35 - column 9, line 31; figures 1-6 * * column 10, line 15 - column 13, line 45; figures 7-9 *; | [E]EP1001116 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [E] 1* column 1, line 43 - column 3, line 58; figure - * |