EP1087208 - Vehicle navigation method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Mannesmann VDO AG Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
de Jong, Cornelis Dick Impalalaan 14 5704 DB Helmond / NL | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/20] |
Former [2001/13] | Klein, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 00118041.3 | 23.08.2000 | [2001/13] | Priority number, date | DE1999145120 | 21.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19945120 | [2001/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1087208 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1087208 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1087208 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/28, G01C21/16, G01S5/14, G01C17/38 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
G01C21/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/13] | G01C21/28, G01S5/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/42] |
Former [2001/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Navigieren eines Fahrzeugs | [2001/13] | English: | Vehicle navigation method | [2001/13] | French: | Méthode pour la navigation d'un véhicule | [2001/13] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 30.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS59104510 ; | [A]US4743913 (TAKAI HIDEO [JP]) [A] 1-7 * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 34; figures 3,4 *; | [A]GB2216272 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-7 * page 9, line 22 - page 13, line 25 * * figures 7A,7B *; | [A]EP0373317 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-7 * page 4, line 15 - line 55 * * abstract *; | [A]DE4208158 (TOKIMEC INC [JP]) [A] 1-7 * column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 25 ** abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841005), vol. 008, no. 219, Database accession no. (P - 306), & JP59104510 A 19840616 (MITSUBISHI DENKI KK) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | Examination | JPH01295312 | EP0496517 | EP0844462 |