EP1083092 - Vehicle floor with a central tunnel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/11] | Vehicle central console | ||
[2004/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofmann, Gustav Münstedterstrasse 19 38114 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
Soltendieck, Bernd Forststrasse 40 38108 Braunschweig / DE | 03 /
Jauch-Paganetti, Michele Spitzwegstrasse 1 38106 Braunschweig / DE | [2001/11] | Application number, filing date | 00118162.7 | 30.08.2000 | [2001/11] | Priority number, date | DE1999142888 | 08.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19942888 | [2001/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1083092 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1083092 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | [2002/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1083092 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60R7/04 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
B60R7/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/11] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugaufbau mit einem Mitteltunnel | [2004/11] | English: | Vehicle floor with a central tunnel | [2004/11] | French: | Plancher d'un véhicule avec un tunnel centrale | [2004/11] |
Former [2001/11] | Mitteltunnel eines Kraftfahrzeugs | ||
Former [2001/11] | Vehicle central console | ||
Former [2001/11] | Console centrale d'un véhicule | Examination procedure | 27.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 01.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 03.11.2004 | FI | 03.11.2004 | GB | 03.11.2004 | IE | 03.11.2004 | NL | 03.11.2004 | DK | 03.02.2005 | GR | 03.02.2005 | SE | 03.02.2005 | PT | 03.04.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | ES | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
GB | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
SE | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
GB | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 03.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8418140U (AUDI); | [A]DE8437440U (AUDI) [A] 10,11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0212262 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 9 * figure 3 *; | [A]US4818008 (CRESSONI ERMANNO [IT]); | [A]US4864886 (BURGEI RUSSELL J [US]); | [A]DE29509677U (LIU ZON FA [TW], et al); | [A]FR2724609 (PEUGEOT [FR]); | [A]DE19529876 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE], et al); | [A]DE19633913 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 7,8 * abstract *; | [PX]DE19855095 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [PX] 1-4,6 * abstract * |