EP1083527 - A method for changing data stored on a universal card [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/11] | A universal magnetic stripe card | ||
[2007/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [2001/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Infosino, William J. 144 Stanie Glenn Rd., Watchung Somerset County, New Jersey 07060 / US | [2001/11] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/11] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00118228.6 | 01.09.2000 | [2001/11] | Priority number, date | US19990391844 | 08.09.1999 Original published format: US 391844 | [2001/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1083527 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1083527 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | [2004/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1083527 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
G06K19/073 (KR);
G06Q20/105 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/357 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40145 (EP,US);
G07F7/0886 (EP,US);
G07F7/1008 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2005/01] |
Former [2004/47] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfähren zur Änderung der auf einer universellen Karte gespeicherten Daten | [2007/31] | English: | A method for changing data stored on a universal card | [2007/31] | French: | Méthode pour changer des données stockées sur une carte universelle | [2007/31] |
Former [2001/11] | Universelle Magnetstreifenkarte | ||
Former [2001/11] | A universal magnetic stripe card | ||
Former [2001/11] | Carte à piste magnétique universelle | Examination procedure | 28.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 26.08.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT | 30.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/52] | Request for further processing for: | 29.07.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 29.07.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.08.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   27.10.2004 | 29.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   27.10.2004 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.11.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9908238 (IBM [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * page 1 - page 9 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9417498 (ENCO TONE LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 2, line 6 - page 5, line 5 * * page 7, line 3 - page 7, line 8 * * page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 6 * * page 13, line 5 * |