EP1088944 - Joint sealing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2005 [2005/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uzin Utz Aktiengesellschaft Dieselstrasse 3 89079 Ulm / DE | [2001/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reck, Bernhard Paradiesstrasse 76 88348 Saulgau / DE | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00118280.7 | 05.09.2000 | [2001/14] | Priority number, date | DE19992017128U | 29.09.1999 Original published format: DE 29917128 U | DE20001027142 | 31.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10027142 | [2001/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1088944 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1088944 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | [2002/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/68 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
E04F15/188 (EP);
E04B1/6809 (EP);
E04B1/6815 (EP);
E04F15/14 (EP);
E04F15/142 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/14] | Title | German: | Fugendichtung | [2001/14] | English: | Joint sealing | [2001/14] | French: | Joint d'étanchéité | [2001/14] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 08.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/25] | 25.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09279704 ; | [XY]CH405382 (BOLTA WERK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,9,10,13,14 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 65; figures 8,9 * [Y] 3,4,6-8,11,12,15,16; | [YA]DE2245430 (EUROFIT JAHN & TRESKE GMBH & C) [Y] 3 * page 5, paragraphs 1,2; figure 1 * [A] 9; | [Y]US4059935 (FAID ROBERT W) [Y] 11,12 * figures 6-9 *; | [Y]DE2930159 (TERBORG HERMANN) [Y] 4 * claims 1,6 *; | [Y]DE3147457 (BENTLER HEINRICH [DE]) [Y] 15,16 * page 9, paragraphs 1,2; figure 1 *; | [YA]EP0399952 (HUBER & SUHNER AG [CH]) [Y] 8 * page 3, line 57 - page 4, line 33 * * page 2, lines 26-29 * [A] 5-7,9; | [XY]DE4340566 (MAPOTRIX GMBH BEDACHUNGSZUBEHO [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,10,13-15,19 * the whole document * [Y] 3,4,6-8; | [Y]DE19742558 (ROLAND SCHMID BAUKUNSTSTOFFE G [DE]) [Y] 6,7 * column 1, lines 13-36; figure 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 02, & JP09279704 A 19971028 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [A] 17,18 * abstract * | Examination | DE19824602 |