EP1083628 - Electrical contact and connector for a flexible printed circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FCI 145/147 Rue Yves Le Coz 78000 Versailles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states FCI 145/147 rue Yves Le Coz 78000 Versailles / FR | ||
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states F.C.I. - Framatome Connectors International Tour Framatome, 1, place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Godefroy, Alban Appt. 11, 6 ruelle du Prieuré 28230 Epernon / FR | 02 /
Cappe, Patrice 7 route de Rambouillet 28210 Faverolles / FR | [2001/11] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00118292.2 | 05.09.2000 | [2001/11] | Priority number, date | FR19990011324 | 07.09.1999 Original published format: FR 9911324 | [2001/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1083628 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1083628 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/24, H01R4/18, H01R13/432, H01R13/436 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
H01R13/4362 (EP);
H01R13/432 (EP);
H01R4/182 (EP);
H01R4/2495 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/11] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Kontakt und Verbinder für flexible gedruckte Schaltungen | [2001/11] | English: | Electrical contact and connector for a flexible printed circuit | [2001/11] | French: | Contact électrique et connecteur pour circuit souple | [2001/11] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 03.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.2006 | BE | 18.10.2006 | CH | 18.10.2006 | CY | 18.10.2006 | FI | 18.10.2006 | IT | 18.10.2006 | LI | 18.10.2006 | NL | 18.10.2006 | DK | 18.01.2007 | SE | 18.01.2007 | DE | 19.01.2007 | GR | 19.01.2007 | PT | 19.03.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/19] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
BE | 18.10.2006 | ||
CH | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
LI | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
DE | 19.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
BE | 18.10.2006 | ||
CH | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
LI | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
DE | 19.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
BE | 18.10.2006 | ||
CH | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
LI | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
BE | 18.10.2006 | ||
CH | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
LI | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
BE | 18.10.2006 | ||
CH | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
LI | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 18.10.2006 | |
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 18.10.2006 | |
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 18.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2290768 (DU PONT NEDERLAND [NL]) [A] 1,7,8 * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 21; figures 1-4 *; | [DYA]US4082402 (KINKAID ROBERT JOHN, et al) [DY] 1 * column 11, line 50 - column 12, line 44; figures 8-11 * [A] 7; | [AD]US4749368 (MOUISSIE BOB [NL]) [AD] 1,4,5 * column 10, line 66 - column 11, line 11; figures 19,20 *; | [Y]EP0700124 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [Y] 1 * column 6, line 44 - line 46; figures 1,8 *; | [A]WO9833246 (LEAR AUTOMOTIVE DEARBORN INC [US]) [A] 9* page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 6; figure 1 * |